This case was last updated from PACER on 02/21/2020 at 21:16:59 (UTC).

Lachman v. Revlon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/14/2019 Lachman filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Revlon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Allyne R. Ross, Ramon E. Reyes, Jr and Rachel P. Kovner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02859

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ramon E. Reyes, Jr

Presiding Judges

Allyne R. Ross

Rachel P. Kovner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Theodore Lachman

Petitioner

OOO iK Barna Group

Defendants

Lorenzo Delpani

Wendel F. Kralovich

Juan R. Figuereo

Fabian T. Garcia

Roberto Simon

Revlon, Inc.

Debra Perelman

Victoria Dolan

Siobhan Anderson

Paul Meister

Christopher H Peterson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

Phillip Kim

Attorney at The Rosen Law Firm

275 Madison Avenue, 40Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Joshua Lon Crowell

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Lesley Frank Portnoy

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

230 Park Avenue, Suite 530

New York, NY 10169

Defendant Attorneys

Sharon L. Nelles

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

125 Bond Street

New York, NY 10004

Nicolas Bourtin

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Akash Mayank Toprani

Attorney at Sullivan and Cromwell LLP

125 Broad St

New York, NY 10004

Matthew A. Schwartz

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

125 Broad Street, 30Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

37 #1

Exhibit

#37

(#37) AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Theodore Lachman, OOO iK Barna Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#36

(#36) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Theodore Lachman, OOO iK Barna Group. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#35

(#35) Letter Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Siobhan Anderson, Victoria Dolan, Juan R. Figuereo, Wendel F. Kralovich, Paul Meister, Debra Perelman, Christopher H Peterson, Revlon, Inc. (Nelles, Sharon) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#34

(#34) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Revlon, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent MacAndrews & Forbes Incorporated for Revlon, Inc.. (Nelles, Sharon) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

33 #15

Exhibit 15 - Q3 2017 Earnings Call Transcript

33 #8

Exhibit 8 - Form 12b-25

33 #7

Exhibit 7 - Q2 2018 Earnings Call Transcript

#31

(#31) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Siobhan Anderson, Victoria Dolan, Juan R. Figuereo, Wendel F. Kralovich, Paul Meister, Debra Perelman, Christopher H Peterson, Revlon, Inc.. (Nelles, Sharon) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

1 #12

Proposed Summons to Dolan

1 #11

Proposed Summons to Simon

1 #10

Proposed Summons to Revlon

1 #9

Proposed Summons to Perelman

1 #7

Proposed Summons to Kralovich

1 #6

Proposed Summons to Garcia

1 #5

Proposed Summons to Figuereo

1 #4

Proposed Summons to Delpani

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Siobhan Anderson, Lorenzo Delpani, Victoria Dolan, Juan R. Figuereo, Fabian T. Garcia, Wendel F. Kralovich, Paul Meister, Debra Perelman, Revlon, Inc., Roberto Simon filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11478059 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Theodore Lachman. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons to Anderson, #4 Proposed Summons to Delpani, #5 Proposed Summons to Figuereo, #6 Proposed Summons to Garcia, #7 Proposed Summons to Kralovich, #8 Proposed Summons to Meister, #9 Proposed Summons to Perelman, #10 Proposed Summons to Revlon, #11 Proposed Summons to Simon, #12 Proposed Summons to Dolan) (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Theodore Lachman, OOO iK Barna Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Theodore Lachman, OOO iK Barna Group. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Letter Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Siobhan Anderson, Victoria Dolan, Juan R. Figuereo, Wendel F. Kralovich, Paul Meister, Debra Perelman, Christopher H Peterson, Revlon, Inc. (Nelles, Sharon) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Revlon, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent MacAndrews & Forbes Incorporated for Revlon, Inc.. (Nelles, Sharon) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Declaration of Akash M. Toprani in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Siobhan Anderson, Victoria Dolan, Juan R. Figuereo, Wendel F. Kralovich, Paul Meister, Debra Perelman, Christopher H Peterson, Revlon, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2014 10-K (Excerpted), #2 Exhibit 2 - 2015 10-K (Excerpted), #3 Exhibit 3 - 2016 10-K (Excerpted), #4 Exhibit 4 - 2017 10-K (Excerpted), #5 Exhibit 5 - Q1 2018 Earnings Call Transcript, #6 Exhibit 6 - Q3 2018 10-Q (Excerpted), #7 Exhibit 7 - Q2 2018 Earnings Call Transcript, #8 Exhibit 8 - Form 12b-25, #9 Exhibit 9 - 2018 10-K (Excerpted), #10 Exhibit 10 - Q4 2017 Earnings Call Transcript, #11 Exhibit 11 - Q3 2018 Earnings Call Transcript, #12 Exhibit 12 - Auditing Standard No. 2201, #13 Exhibit 13 - Q1 2018 10-Q (Excerpted), #14 Exhibit 14 - Q2 2018 10-Q (Excerpted), #15 Exhibit 15 - Q3 2017 Earnings Call Transcript) (Nelles, Sharon) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MEMORANDUM in Support re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Siobhan Anderson, Victoria Dolan, Juan R. Figuereo, Wendel F. Kralovich, Paul Meister, Debra Perelman, Christopher H Peterson, Revlon, Inc.. (Nelles, Sharon) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Siobhan Anderson, Victoria Dolan, Juan R. Figuereo, Wendel F. Kralovich, Paul Meister, Debra Perelman, Christopher H Peterson, Revlon, Inc.. (Nelles, Sharon) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner. Judge Allyne R. Ross no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Letter Serving Motion to Dismiss Papers with Copy to Judge Ross by Siobhan Anderson, Victoria Dolan, Juan R. Figuereo, Wendel F. Kralovich, Paul Meister, Debra Perelman, Christopher H Peterson, Revlon, Inc. (Nelles, Sharon) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Appearance by Akash Mayank Toprani on behalf of Christopher H Peterson (aty to be noticed) (Toprani, Akash) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DECLARATION re #7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment of OOO iK Barna Group as Lead Plaintiff by OOO iK Barna Group (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Press Release, #2 Exhibit B - Movant Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D - GPM Firm Resume) (Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment of OOO iK Barna Group as Lead Plaintiff filed by OOO iK Barna Group. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment of OOO iK Barna Group as Lead Plaintiff by OOO iK Barna Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff filed by Theodore Lachman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PSLRA Early Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - PSLRA Certification, #3 Exhibit 3 - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit 4 - Firm Resume) (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff by Theodore Lachman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Siobhan Anderson, Lorenzo Delpani, Victoria Dolan, Juan R. Figuereo, Fabian T. Garcia, Wendel F. Kralovich, Paul Meister, Debra Perelman, Revlon, Inc., Roberto Simon filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11478059 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Theodore Lachman. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons to Anderson, #4 Proposed Summons to Delpani, #5 Proposed Summons to Figuereo, #6 Proposed Summons to Garcia, #7 Proposed Summons to Kralovich, #8 Proposed Summons to Meister, #9 Proposed Summons to Perelman, #10 Proposed Summons to Revlon, #11 Proposed Summons to Simon, #12 Proposed Summons to Dolan) (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Revlon Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lesley F. Portnoy