This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 08:41:47 (UTC).

LaChase v. Facebook

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 LaChase filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Facebook. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Darrin P. Gayles and Lisette M. Reid. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-22960

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Darrin P. Gayles

Referral Judge

Lisette M. Reid

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charlton LaChase

Miami, FL 33101

Defendant

Facebook

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Inquiry by Charlton LaChase. (Copy of Docket Sheet and Complaint form was mailed) (jbs) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER Complaint, [ 1], is DISMISSED. Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #6 , is DENIED. If he so chooses, Plaintiff must file his amended complaint as to the Title III claim on or before September 18, 2020. Administratively Closing Case. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 8/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charlton LaChase. (jbs) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#4

(#4) Notice to Update my Statement on Waiver Fee by Charlton LaChase re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (jbs) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charlton LaChase. (ebz) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#1

(#1) Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Facebook. Filing fee $ 400.00. IFP Motion Filed/No Monies Paid, filed by Charlton LaChase.(ebz) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Inquiry by Charlton LaChase. (Copy of Docket Sheet and Complaint form was mailed) (jbs) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Complaint, [ 1], is DISMISSED. Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #6 , is DENIED. If he so chooses, Plaintiff must file his amended complaint as to the Title III claim on or before September 18, 2020. Administratively Closing Case. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 8/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charlton LaChase. (jbs) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Although plaintiff purported to file his prison trust account statement, it is not a trust fund account statement obtained from the appropriate official at his current prison that shows his deposits, withdraws, and balance for the "6-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint." See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/24/2020. (js05) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice to Update my Statement on Waiver Fee by Charlton LaChase re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (jbs) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charlton LaChase. (ebz) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Facebook. Filing fee $ 400.00. IFP Motion Filed/No Monies Paid, filed by Charlton LaChase.(ebz) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less