This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2022 at 09:37:03 (UTC).

Lacee Lacesa et al v. Walgreen Co. et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2022 Lacee Lacesa filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walgreen Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark C. Scarsi and Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02558

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark C. Scarsi

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lacee Lacesa

Ezra Lacesa

Asher Lacesa

E. L.

A. L.

Defendants

Walgreen Co.

Mylan Specialty, L.P.

Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Mylan LLC

Pfizer Inc.

Stuart Epstein

Does 1 to 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eva Silva

Attorney at Trial Lawyers for Justice

548 Market Street Pmb 76421

San Francisco, CA 94104

Daniel Carl Schaar

Attorney at Trial Lawyers for Justice

548 Market Street, Pmb 76421

San Francisco, CA 94104-5401

Nicholas Charles Rowley

Attorney at Trial Lawyers for Justice

548 Market Street, Pmb 76421

San Francisco, CA 94104-5401

Defendant Attorneys

Loren S Leibl

Attorney at Leibl Miretsky and Mosely LLP

5014 Chesebro Road

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

Michael Miretsky

Attorney at Leibl Miretsky and Mosely LLP

5014 Chesebro Road

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

Peter Joseph Horton

Attorney at Leibl Miretsky and Mosely LLP

5014 Chesebro Road

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

Brooke Killian Kim

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP US

401 B Street Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Jessica C Wilson

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

401 B Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#38

No Description Available

#37

No Description Available

35 #1

Proposed Order

35 #35

Main Document

34 #3

Proposed Order Proposed Order

34 #2

Declaration Declaration of Peter J. Horton

34 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

34 #34

Main Document

33 #3

Proposed Order Proposed Order

33 #2

Declaration Declaration of Peter J. Horton

33 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

33 #33

Main Document

#32

No Description Available

#31

No Description Available

#30

No Description Available

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • Docket(#57) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than May 22, 2023. (smo) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • Docket(#56) ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2023 at 2:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 8/15/2023 at 8:30 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. See document for additional pretrial dates and deadlines. (smo) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • Docket(#55) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: PETITION for Appointment of Lacee Lacesa as Guardian ad Litem for A.L. #46 , PETITION for Appointment of Lacee Lacesa as Guardian ad Litem for E.L. #47 by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. The document is STRICKEN and counsel is ordered to re-file them. (es) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Docket(#54) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DEEMING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION AS MOOT (ECF No. #48 ) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: Considering the Court taking the scheduling conference off calendar (ECF No. 53 ), the Request for Leave of Dan Schaar to Appear by Telephone at the Scheduling Conference (ECF No. #48 ) is DENIED as MOOT. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Docket(#53) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on June 13, 2022 is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar and under submission. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Docket(#52) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST for Leave of Dan Schaar to Appear for Telephonic #48 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. 1) filing is a Combined request and Order thereon. The combined Format is not applicable in e-filing which requires proposed order be formally prepared and submitted as a separate attachment to a main document. 2) Filer has erroneously set request on Judge's Motion calendar for 6/13/2022 10:00. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Docket(#51) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: PETITION for Appointment of Lacee Lacesa as Guardian ad Litem for A.L. #46 , PETITION for Appointment of Lacee Lacesa as Guardian ad Litem for E.L. #47 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Filing was a Combined Petition, consent and Order therein filed as 1 pdf document, a format not applicable in e-filing which requires orders to be formally and separately prepared and submitted as an attachment to a main document. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • Docket(#50) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs A. L., E. L., Lacee Lacesa, re PETITION for Appointment of Lacee Lacesa as Guardian ad Litem for A.L. #46 , PETITION for Appointment of Lacee Lacesa as Guardian ad Litem for E.L. #47 served on 06/07/2022. (Silva, Eva) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • Docket(#49) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs A. L., E. L., Lacee Lacesa, re REQUEST for Leave of Dan Schaar to Appear for Telephonic #48 served on 06/07/2022. (Silva, Eva) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • Docket(#48) REQUEST for Leave of Dan Schaar to Appear for Telephonic filed by Plaintiffs A. L., E. L., Lacee Lacesa. Request set for hearing on 6/13/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (Silva, Eva) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): It appears the name of an individual known to be a minor is contained in documents filed with the Court. Fed R Civ P 5.2(a) requires that a minor's initials (as opposed to a minor's spell-out name) be used on documents filed with this Court, unless the Court orders otherwise. You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs. (sh) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (sh) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs A. L., E. L., Lacee Lacesa as to Stuart Epstein. [ SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Walgreen Co. JURY DEMANDED. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 01/10/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 4 EXHIBIT 1 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Stuart Epstein, Mylan LLC, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, L.P., Pfizer Inc., Walgreen Co. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs A. L., E. L., Lacee Lacesa. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 07/08/2021 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 4 EXHIBIT C TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Mylan LLC, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, L.P., Pfizer Inc. (Kim, Brooke) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Mylan LLC, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, L.P., Pfizer Inc.. (Kim, Brooke) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SEALED DOCUMENT- PER 4/25/2022 MINUTE ORDER DOCKET NO. 13).NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV25128 Receipt No: ACACDC-33139866 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan LLC, Pfizer Inc., Mylan Specialty, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brooke Kim, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Attorney Brooke Killian Kim added to party Mylan LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Brooke Killian Kim added to party Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Brooke Killian Kim added to party Mylan Specialty, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Brooke Killian Kim added to party Pfizer Inc.(pty:dft))(Kim, Brooke) Modified on 4/25/2022 (lc). (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mylan Specialty, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where MYLAN INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Walgreen Co. is a litigant