This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2019 at 07:37:58 (UTC).

Laccinole v Verizon et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2019 Laccinole filed an Other lawsuit against Verizon. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia A. Sullivan, William E. Smith and Mary S. McElroy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00501

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia A. Sullivan

Presiding Judges

William E. Smith

Mary S. McElroy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Laccinole

Narragansett, RI 02882

Defendants

Verizon New England Inc

Verizon Online LLC

Verizon Wireless LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Kathryn M. Garrison

Attorney at Tucker, Dyer & O'Connell, LLP

199 Wells Avenue

Newton, MA 02459

Brian A. O'Connell

Attorney at Tucker, Dyer & O'Connell, LLP

199 Wells Avenue, Suite 301

Newton, MA 02459

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 12/2/2019. (Garrison, Kathryn) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#11

(#11) REPLY to Response re #10 Response to Motion To Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Garrison, Kathryn) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

10 #1

Envelope

#10

(#10) RESPONSE In Opposition to #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Christopher Laccinole. Replies due by 11/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. O'Connell on behalf of Verizon New England Inc, Verizon Online LLC, Verizon Wireless LLC (O'Connell, Brian) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

8 #1

Envelope

#8

(#8) MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Christopher Laccinole. Responses due by 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Smith, Rana) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Verizon Wireless LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bell Atlantic Mobile Systems, Corporate Parent Verizon Americas, Corporate Parent GTE Wireless of the Midwest, Corporate Parent GTE Wireless LLC, Corporate Parent Cellco Partnership for Verizon Wireless LLC.. (Garrison, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Verizon Online LLC identifying Corporate Parent NYNEX LLC, Corporate Parent GTE Wireless, Corporate Parent GTE LLC, Corporate Parent VZ Ventures LLC, Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc. for Verizon Online LLC.. (Garrison, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Verizon New England Inc identifying Corporate Parent NYNEX LLC, Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc. for Verizon New England Inc.. (Garrison, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

4 #6

Exhibit F

4 #5

Exhibit E

4 #4

Exhibit D

4 #3

Exhibit C

4 #2

Exhibit B

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Verizon New England Inc, Verizon Online LLC, Verizon Wireless LLC. Responses due by 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Garrison, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#3

(#3) COPY of STATE COURT COMPLAINT FILED in accordance with LR Cv 81(a). Regarding: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 12/2/2019. (Garrison, Kathryn) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPLY to Response re #10 Response to Motion To Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Garrison, Kathryn) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESPONSE In Opposition to #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Christopher Laccinole. Replies due by 11/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. O'Connell on behalf of Verizon New England Inc, Verizon Online LLC, Verizon Wireless LLC (O'Connell, Brian) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 11/7/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 10/29/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Christopher Laccinole. Responses due by 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Smith, Rana) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Verizon Wireless LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bell Atlantic Mobile Systems, Corporate Parent Verizon Americas, Corporate Parent GTE Wireless of the Midwest, Corporate Parent GTE Wireless LLC, Corporate Parent Cellco Partnership for Verizon Wireless LLC.. (Garrison, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Verizon Online LLC identifying Corporate Parent NYNEX LLC, Corporate Parent GTE Wireless, Corporate Parent GTE LLC, Corporate Parent VZ Ventures LLC, Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc. for Verizon Online LLC.. (Garrison, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Verizon New England Inc identifying Corporate Parent NYNEX LLC, Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc. for Verizon New England Inc.. (Garrison, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • TEXT ORDER: This matter is hereby transferred to the calendar of District Judge Mary S. McElroy for all further proceedings (as related to CA19-299, et al.). So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/18/2019. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Verizon New England Inc, Verizon Online LLC, Verizon Wireless LLC. Responses due by 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Garrison, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COPY of STATE COURT COMPLAINT FILED in accordance with LR Cv 81(a). Regarding: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2019-0469. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1419112, filed by Verizon New England Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Complaint, #3 Affidavit Notice of Removal, #4 Affidavit Notice of Appearance)(Garrison, Kathryn) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2019-0469. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1419112, filed by Verizon New England Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Complaint, #3 Affidavit Notice of Removal, #4 Affidavit Notice of Appearance)(Garrison, Kathryn) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Verizon New England Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where VERIZON WIRELESS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Verizon Online LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian A. O'Connell