This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/08/2022 at 08:08:02 (UTC).

LaBrec, Matthew v. Glass, Michael et al

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 LaBrec, Matthew filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Glass, Michael. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00258

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matthew LaBrec

Portage, WI 53901-0900

Defendants

Michael Glass

Ryan Blount

Larry Fuchs

Dontaeva Acklin

Armon Myadze

Angel Genman

Shannon Hubele

Sergeant Bender

Kyle Ferstl

Francis Balderston

Not Classified By Court

CCI Prison Facility

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Interview/Information Request

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Interview/Information Request

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Interview/Information Request

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Public Records Request Response

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Complaint Number CCI-2021-3725 Documents

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - Notice of Injury and Claim

1 #7

Exhibit 7 - Notice of Injury and Claim

#2

(#2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Matthew LaBrec. (aom),(ps) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER that Plaintiff submits a Trust Fund Account Statement by 5/31/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 05/09/2022. (aom),(ps) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 113.71 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 6/8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 05/18/2022. (aom),(ps) . (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#6

(#6) Letter from Plaintiff LaBrec Regarding Trust Fund Account Statement. (aom),(ps) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#7

(#7) Warden PLRA Letter. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Warden PLRA Letter. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketInitial Partial Filing fee received: $ 113.71, receipt number 34690040702. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from Plaintiff LaBrec Regarding Trust Fund Account Statement. (aom),(ps) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 113.71 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 6/8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 05/18/2022. (aom),(ps) . (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Matthew LaBrec (Attachments: #1 Copy of dkt 3 NEF, #2 Copy of Disbursement Request, #3 IPP Calculation) (aom),(ps) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER that Plaintiff submits a Trust Fund Account Statement by 5/31/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 05/09/2022. (aom),(ps) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Matthew LaBrec. (aom),(ps) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Matthew LaBrec. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Interview/Information Request, #2 Exhibit 2 - Interview/Information Request, #3 Exhibit 3 - Interview/Information Request, #4 Exhibit 4 - Public Records Request Response, #5 Exhibit 5 - Complaint Number CCI-2021-3725 Documents, #6 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Injury and Claim, #7 Exhibit 7 - Notice of Injury and Claim) (aom),(ps) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CCI Prison Facility is a litigant