This case was last updated from PACER on 04/23/2019 at 07:20:26 (UTC).

Laborers' International Union North America, Local 872 v. City of Las Vegas et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2019 Laborers' International Union North America, Local 872 filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Las Vegas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nancy J. Koppe and Gloria M. Navarro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00322

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nancy J. Koppe

Presiding Judge

Gloria M. Navarro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laborers' International Union North America, Local 872

Defendants

James Robert Coffin

Steve Seroka

City of Las Vegas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rusty Graf

Attorney at Black & Lobello

10777 W. Twain Ave., Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89135

Shannon M. Wilson

10777 W. Twain Ave., 3Rd Flr

Las Vegas, NV 89135

Defendant Attorneys

Peter M. Angulo

Attorney at Olson, Cannon, Gormley, Angulo & Stoberski

9950 West Cheyenne Avenue

Las Vegas, NV 89129

William D. Schuller

Attorney at Kolesar & Leatham

400 S. Rampart Blvd., Suite 400

Las Vegas, NV 89145

Alan J. Lefebvre

Attorney at Kolesar & Leatham

400 South Rampart Boulevard, 3320 West Sahara Avenue, Suite 380, Suite 400

Las Vegas, NV 89145

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) REPLY to Response to #11 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants James Robert Coffin, Steve Seroka. (Angulo, Peter) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#23

(#23) JOINDER to #21 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants James Robert Coffin, Steve Seroka. (Angulo, Peter) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#22

(#22) RESPONSE to #11 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Laborers' International Union North America, Local 872. Replies due by 4/22/2019. (Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

21 #4

Exhibit D

21 #3

Exhibit C

21 #2

Exhibit B

21 #1

Exhibit A

#21

(#21) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendant City of Las Vegas. Responses due by 4/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Schuller, William) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#11

(#15) JOINDER to #11 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant City of Las Vegas. (Schuller, William) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#6

(#6) DECLARATION of Service as to Defendant City of Las Vegas re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Laborers' International Union North America, Local 872. (Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#5

(#5) DECLARATION re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Laborers' International Union North America, Local 872. (Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Laborers' International Union North America, Local 872. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#21) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendant City of Las Vegas. Responses due by 4/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Schuller, William) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) REPLY to Response to #11 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants James Robert Coffin, Steve Seroka. (Angulo, Peter) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) JOINDER to #21 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants James Robert Coffin, Steve Seroka. (Angulo, Peter) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) RESPONSE to #11 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Laborers' International Union North America, Local 872. Replies due by 4/22/2019. (Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendant City of Las Vegas. Responses due by 4/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Schuller, William) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) REPLY to Response to #12 Motion to Stay Case by Defendants James Robert Coffin, Steve Seroka. (Angulo, Peter) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) RESPONSE to #12 Motion to Stay Case by Plaintiff Laborers' International Union North America, Local 872. Replies due by 4/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2) (Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) REPLY to #17 Response to #8 MOTION to Extend Time; filed by Defendant City of Las Vegas. (Schuller, William) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Plaintiff Laborers' International Union North America, Local 872. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - 4 - Declaration of Srv, #3 Exhibit 5 - Affidavit of Counsel) (Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER Re: #12 Motion to Stay Case. Responses due by 4/5/2019. Replies due by 4/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) JOINDER to #11 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant City of Las Vegas. (Schuller, William) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:18-cv-00547 by Defendant City of Las Vegas. (Schuller, William) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant City of Las Vegas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Schuller, William) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DECLARATION of Service as to Defendant James Coffin re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Laborers' International Union North America, Local 872. (Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DECLARATION of Service as to Defendant City of Las Vegas re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Laborers' International Union North America, Local 872. (Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DECLARATION re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Laborers' International Union North America, Local 872. (Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Laborers' International Union North America, Local 872. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/25/2019. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich.This case has been randomly assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JM) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5441626) by Laborers' International Union North America, Local 872. Proof of service due by 5/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Graf, Rusty) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Laborers' International Union of North America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rusty Graf