This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2019 at 11:17:25 (UTC).

LABORERS' COMBINED FUNDS OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA v. POWELL CONSTRUCTORS INCORPORATED et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 LABORERS' COMBINED FUNDS OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against POWELL CONSTRUCTORS INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Peter J. Phipps. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00337

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Peter J. Phipps

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LABORERS' COMBINED FUNDS OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA

Defendants

POWELL CONSTRUCTORS INCORPORATED

VICTOR GREGORY POWELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Neil J. Gregorio

Attorney at Tucker Arensberg

1500 One Ppg Place

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Ian M. Grecco

Attorney at Tucker Arensberg, P.C.

1500 One Ppg Place

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

8 #2

Proposed Order

8 #1

Affidavit of Default Judgment

#8

#7

6 #2

Notice of Default

6 #1

Affidavit for Entry of Default

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Summons for Victor Gregory Powell

1 #2

Summons for Powell Constructors Incorporated

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Default Judgment against VICTOR GREGORY POWELL, POWELL CONSTRUCTORS INCORPORATED by LABORERS' COMBINED FUNDS OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Default Judgment, #2 Proposed Order) (Gregorio, Neil) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to VICTOR GREGORY POWELL, POWELL CONSTRUCTORS INCORPORATED. (ksa) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST by LABORERS' COMBINED FUNDS OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA for entry of DEFAULT against VICTOR GREGORY POWELL, POWELL CONSTRUCTORS INCORPORATED . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Entry of Default, #2 Notice of Default) (Grecco, Ian) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by LABORERS' COMBINED FUNDS OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA. VICTOR GREGORY POWELL served on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019. (Grecco, Ian) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by LABORERS' COMBINED FUNDS OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA. POWELL CONSTRUCTORS INCORPORATED served on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019. (Grecco, Ian) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Ian M. Grecco on behalf of LABORERS' COMBINED FUNDS OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA. (Grecco, Ian) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to VICTOR GREGORY POWELL, POWELL CONSTRUCTORS INCORPORATED. (ksa) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against VICTOR GREGORY POWELL, POWELL CONSTRUCTORS INCORPORATED (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5079733), filed by LABORERS' COMBINED FUNDS OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Powell Constructors Incorporated, #3 Summons for Victor Gregory Powell) (ksa) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POWELL CONSTRUCTORS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LABORERS' COMBINED FUNDS OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ian M. Grecco Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil J. Gregorio