This case was last updated from PACER on 10/10/2020 at 07:57:07 (UTC).

LaBarbera v. Johnson and Johnson

Case Summary

On 08/11/2020 LaBarbera filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson and Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joanna Seybert and Arlene R. Lindsay. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-03609

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joanna Seybert

Referral Judge

Arlene R. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Philip LaBarbera

Defendant

Johnson and Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian A. Goldstein

Attorney at Cellino & Barnes PC

2500 Main Place Tower, 350 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14202-3725

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CERTIFIED JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 226) IN RE: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 2738. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of October 4, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. (Ortiz, Grisel) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#7

(#7) JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 226) IN RE: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 2738. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of October 4, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. (Ortiz, Grisel) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF RELATED ACTIONS filed before the JPMDL. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE: Pursuant to R.P.J.P.M.L. 4.l(b), please find enclosed the Notice of Related Actions filed by Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., filed with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation today. (Florio, Lisa) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#4

(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Defendants on 08/11/2020 by Philip LaBarbera, Individually and as Executor of the Estate of Arlene A. LaBarbera (Deceased). Waiver of Service due by 10/13/2020. (Goldstein, Brian) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Johnson and Johnson filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-13192894, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Philip LaBarbera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Goldstein, Brian) Modified on 8/11/2020 (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 08/11/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCase transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in District of New Jersey [LIVE] as case 3:20-cv-12390, filed 09/08/2020. (Florio, Lisa) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCase electronically transferred to District of New Jersey. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Ortiz, Grisel) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFIED JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 226) IN RE: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 2738. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of October 4, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. (Ortiz, Grisel) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 226) IN RE: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 2738. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of October 4, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. (Ortiz, Grisel) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF RELATED ACTIONS filed before the JPMDL. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE: Pursuant to R.P.J.P.M.L. 4.l(b), please find enclosed the Notice of Related Actions filed by Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., filed with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation today. (Florio, Lisa) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Defendants on 08/11/2020 by Philip LaBarbera, Individually and as Executor of the Estate of Arlene A. LaBarbera (Deceased). Waiver of Service due by 10/13/2020. (Goldstein, Brian) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Johnson and Johnson filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-13192894, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Philip LaBarbera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Goldstein, Brian) Modified on 8/11/2020 (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less