This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/15/2019 at 07:49:54 (UTC).

LAB VERDICT, INC. et al v. LAB EQUIP LTD. et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2019 LAB VERDICT, INC filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against LAB EQUIP LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Patrick Hanlon and Mark J. Dinsmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02947

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Patrick Hanlon

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LAWRENCE JOHNSON

LAB VERDICT, INC.

Defendants

LAB EQUIP LTD.

MARK RAFMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Clinton E. Blanck

Attorney at BLANCK LEGAL, P.C.

9245 North Meridian Street, Suite 301

Indianapolis, IN 46260

Defendant Attorneys

Adam Arceneaux

Attorney at ICE MILLER LLP (Indianapolis)

One American Square, Suite 2900

Indianapolis, IN 46282

Alexandria Hanauer Pittman

Attorney at ICE MILLER LLP (Indianapolis)

One American Square, Suite 2900

Indianapolis, IN 46282

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order of Dismissal

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

1 #4

Exhibit D - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - Operative Complaint with Exhibits

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Record (Appearance, Complaint and Exhibits, Summonses, A

1 #1

Exhibit A - Settlement Demand

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiffs LAWRENCE JOHNSON, LAB VERDICT, INC. . (Blanck, Clinton) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) REPLY in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , filed by Defendants LAB EQUIP LTD., MARK RAFMAN. (Arceneaux, Adam) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , filed by Plaintiffs LAWRENCE JOHNSON, LAB VERDICT, INC.. (Blanck, Clinton) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE to Notice of Removal, re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiffs LAWRENCE JOHNSON, LAB VERDICT, INC.. (Blanck, Clinton) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , filed by Defendants LAB EQUIP LTD., MARK RAFMAN. (Arceneaux, Adam) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , filed by Defendants LAB EQUIP LTD., MARK RAFMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of Dismissal)(Arceneaux, Adam) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER - Defendant removed this action to this Court on July 17, 2019, alleging that the Court has diversity jurisdiction over this case. Dkt. 1 at 1. Local Rule 81-1(b) provides: Within 30 days after the filing of the notice of removal, every plaintiff who has not filed a motion to remand must file a statement responding to the notice of removal's allegations as to the citizenship of the parties and the amount in controversy. If the plaintiff lacks sufficient information upon which to form a belief about those allegations despite meeting and conferring in good faith with the removing party about them, the plaintiff may so state. More than 30 days have passed since the filing of the notice of removal, yet Plaintiffs have not moved to remand or filed a response. The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to comply with Local Rule 81-1 by September 10, 2019. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 8/19/2019.(JDH) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: This matter is currently set for telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference on Monday, September 23, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. The Court, sua sponte, hereby changes the time to 3:30 p.m. (Eastern) on that same date. All other requirements set forth the Court's Scheduling Order dated July 18, 2019 [Dkt. 8] remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/23/2019.(SWM) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting Defendants' #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 8/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/23/2019. (SWM) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 11:30 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. The parties shall file a CMP no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/18/2019.(CBU) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to August 21, 2019 to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, filed by Defendants LAB EQUIP LTD., MARK RAFMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Arceneaux, Adam) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE (Certificate of Compliance with Notice of Removal Procedures), filed by Defendants LAB EQUIP LTD., MARK RAFMAN (Arceneaux, Adam) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LAB EQUIP LTD.. (Arceneaux, Adam) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandria Hanauer Pittman on behalf of Defendants LAB EQUIP LTD., MARK RAFMAN. (Pittman, Alexandria) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Arceneaux on behalf of Defendants LAB EQUIP LTD., MARK RAFMAN. (Arceneaux, Adam) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior Court, case number 49D06-1905-PL-021807, filed by All Defendants. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5532882) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Demand, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Record (Appearance, Complaint and Exhibits, Summonses, Appearance, Notice of Automatic Enlargement of Time, Docket), #3 Exhibit C - Operative Complaint with Exhibits, #4 Exhibit D - Civil Cover Sheet)(Arceneaux, Adam) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexandria Hanauer Pittman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Arceneaux