This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/28/2021 at 08:44:39 (UTC).

L.A. T Shirt and Print, Inc. v. Rue21, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 L A T Shirt and Print, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Rue21, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-11785

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

L.A. T Shirt & Print, Inc., a California corporation

L.A. T-Shirt and Print, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Riot Society

Defendants

New rue21, LLC

R21 Holdings, Inc.

New RSC, LLC

New Rue21, Inc.

R Services LLC

Rue21, Inc.

DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,

New Rue21 Intermediate, Inc.

New Rue21 Holdco, Inc.

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Farhad Novian

Attorney at Novian and Novian LLP

1801 Century Park East Suite 1201

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Michael Jason O'Brien

Attorney at Novian and Novian LLP

1801 Century Park East Suite 1201, 310-553-122

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Sharon Raminfard

Attorney at Novian and Novian LLP

1801 Century Park East Suite 1201

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Zachary A Cohen

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

David Martinez

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3208

 

Court Documents

#34

#32

#31

#30

#29

#28

#27

#26

#2

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO AMEND PLEADINGS (DKT. #33 )by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint shall be filed on or before March 2, 2021. Defendants' response to the First Amended Complaint shall be filed or before March 23, 2021. (lom) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff L.A. T-Shirt and Print, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Raminfard, Sharon) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to New Rue21 Intermediate, Inc. answer now due 2/11/2021; New RSC, LLC answer now due 2/11/2021; New Rue21, LLC answer now due 2/11/2021; New Rue21 Holdco, Inc. answer now due 2/11/2021; R21 Holdings, Inc. answer now due 2/11/2021; R Services LLC answer now due 2/11/2021; Rue21, Inc. answer now due 2/11/2021; New Rue21, Inc. answer now due 2/11/2021, filed by Defendants New Rue21 Intermediate, Inc.; New RSC, LLC; New Rue21, LLC; New Rue21 Holdco, Inc.; R21 Holdings, Inc.; R Services LLC; Rue21, Inc.; New Rue21, Inc..(Attorney David Martinez added to party New RSC, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Martinez added to party New Rue21 Holdco, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David Martinez added to party New Rue21 Intermediate, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David Martinez added to party New Rue21, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David Martinez added to party New Rue21, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Martinez added to party R Services LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Martinez added to party R21 Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David Martinez added to party Rue21, Inc.(pty:dft))(Martinez, David) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff L.A. T-Shirt and Print, Inc., upon Defendant Rue21, Inc. served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren-Managing Agent in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Novian, Farhad) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff L.A. T-Shirt and Print, Inc., upon Defendant New RSC, LLC served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lynanne Gares-Managing Agent in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Novian, Farhad) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff L.A. T-Shirt and Print, Inc., upon Defendant New Rue21, Inc. served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lynanne Gares-Managing Agent in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Novian, Farhad) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff L.A. T-Shirt and Print, Inc., upon Defendant New Rue21 Holdco, Inc. served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lynanne Gares-Managing Agent in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Novian, Farhad) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff L.A. T-Shirt and Print, Inc., upon Defendant New Rue21, LLC served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lynanne Gares-Managing Agent in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Novian, Farhad) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff L.A. T-Shirt and Print, Inc., upon Defendant New Rue21 Intermediate, Inc. served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lynanne Gares-Managing Agent in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Novian, Farhad) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff L.A. T-Shirt and Print, Inc., upon Defendant R21 Holdings, Inc. served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lynanne Gares-Managing Agent in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Novian, Farhad) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff L.A. T Shirt & Print, Inc., a California corporation. (Novian, Farhad) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff L.A. T Shirt & Print, Inc., a California corporation. (Novian, Farhad) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff L.A. T Shirt & Print, Inc., a California corporation. (Novian, Farhad) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff L.A. T Shirt & Print, Inc., a California corporation. (Novian, Farhad) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff L.A. T Shirt & Print, Inc., a California corporation. (Novian, Farhad) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by L.A. T Shirt & Print, Inc., a California corporation. (Novian, Farhad) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by L.A. T Shirt & Print, Inc., a California corporation. (Novian, Farhad) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff L.A. T Shirt & Print, Inc., a California corporation. (Novian, Farhad) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff L.A. T Shirt & Print, Inc., a California corporation, identifying L.A. T-SHIRT & PRINT, INC. dba RIOT SOCIETY; RUE 21, INC.; NEW RUE21 HOLDCO, INC.; NEW RSC, LLC; R SERVICES LLC; NEW RUE21, INC.; NEW RUE21 INTERMEDIATE, INC.; NEW RUE21, LLC; R21 HOLDINGS, INC.. (Novian, Farhad) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29791755 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff L.A. T Shirt & Print, Inc., a California corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Attorney Farhad Novian added to party L.A. T Shirt & Print, Inc., a California corporation(pty:pla))(Novian, Farhad) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where L.A. T Shirt & Print, Inc., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Rue21, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where New rue21, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Martinez