This case was last updated from PACER on 03/14/2020 at 08:48:45 (UTC).

LA Park La Brea B, LLC v. Tywanya Hill

Case Summary

On 01/14/2020 LA Park La Brea B, LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Tywanya Hill. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gail J. Standish and John A. Kronstadt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00391

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gail J. Standish

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LA Park La Brea B, LLC

Defendant

Tywanya Hill

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Linda Tracey Hollenbeck

Attorney at Hollenbeck and Cardoso LLP

444 West Ocean Boulevard Suite 705

Long Beach, CA 90802

 

Court Documents

1 #1

CV71

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Tywanya Hill. (jtil) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Tywanya Hill from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STUD09297. Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (Attachments: #1 CV71) (jtil) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge John A. Kronstadt that this matter be, and hereby is, REMANDED to the Superior Court of California for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Tywanya Hill. (jtil) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake) (Entered: 01/19/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (jtil) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge John A. Kronstadt that the request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 is hereby DENIED. IT IS RECOMMENDED by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish for the following reasons: (1) District Court lacks jurisdiction. (2) The notice of removal does not comply with 28 USC sec. 1446(a). Plaintiff has not identified any possible basis for federal jurisdiction and none appears possible, given that plaintiff apparently is purporting to remove a state court unlawful detainer action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby REMANDED to State Court. (jp) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#10

(#10) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse. Case number: 19STUD03297. (jp) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/13/2020. (ake) (Entered: 01/19/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse. Case number: 19STUD03297. (jp) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge John A. Kronstadt that this matter be, and hereby is, REMANDED to the Superior Court of California for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge John A. Kronstadt that the request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 is hereby DENIED. IT IS RECOMMENDED by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish for the following reasons: (1) District Court lacks jurisdiction. (2) The notice of removal does not comply with 28 USC sec. 1446(a). Plaintiff has not identified any possible basis for federal jurisdiction and none appears possible, given that plaintiff apparently is purporting to remove a state court unlawful detainer action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby REMANDED to State Court. (jp) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/13/2020. (ake) (Entered: 01/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake) (Entered: 01/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (jtil) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Tywanya Hill. (jtil) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Tywanya Hill. (jtil) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Tywanya Hill from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STUD09297. Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (Attachments: #1 CV71) (jtil) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.