This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:10:14 (UTC).

La Mojarra Loca, Inc. v. Wells Fargo Merchant Services LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 La Mojarra Loca, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Wells Fargo Merchant Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sandra J. Feuerstein and Steven I. Locke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-06798

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sandra J. Feuerstein

Referral Judge

Steven I. Locke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

La Mojarra Loca, Inc.

Defendants

Wells Fargo Bank N.A.

Wells Fargo & Co

First Data Merchant Services Corporation

Wells Fargo Merchant Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel W Anderson

Attorney at Mills & Anderson

703 S. 8Th Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher D Kircher

Attorney at Semenza Kircher Rickard

10161 Park Run Dr., Ste. 150

Las Vegas, NV 89145

Lawrence J Semenza, III

Attorney at Semenza Kircher Rickard

10161 Park Run Drive, Suite 150

Las Vegas, NV 89145

Katie Lynn Cannata

Attorney at Semenza Kircher Rickard

10161 Park Run Drive, Suite 150

Las Vegas, NV 89145

Jarrod L. Rickard

Attorney at Semenza Kircher Rickard

10161 Park Run Drive, Suite 150

Las Vegas, NV 89145

John Peterson

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

401 Commerce Street, Suite 900

Nashville, TN 37219

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein for Civil Cause for Initial Conference Hearing held on 1/30/2020: Plaintiff's attorney Daniel Anderson present; Defendant's attorney Matt Knoop and John Peterson present; Case called. OTHER: Motion to be served by 3/2/2020. Opposition to be served by 4/1/2020. Reply to be served and fully briefed motion to be filed with the Court by 4/13/2020. A status conference is scheduled before Judge Feuerstein on 7/13/2020 at 11:15 am. (Cubano, Jazmin) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#20

(#20) Defendants ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Wells Fargo Merchant Services, LLC. (Peterson, John) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by John Peterson on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Wells Fargo Merchant Services, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Peterson, John) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#18

(#18) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

17 #1

*Restricted*

#17

(#17) Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:19-cv-00725. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#16

(#16) ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that #3 defendants' motion to dismiss or alternatively transfer venue be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the matter of La Mojarra Loca, Inc. v. Wells Fargo Merchant Services LLC et al., case number 2:19-cv-00725-JCM-DJA, be, and the same hereby is, TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #7 Stipulation by Plaintiff La Mojarra Loca, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Anderson, Daniel) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#7

(#9) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #7 Stipulation by Plaintiff La Mojarra Loca, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Anderson, Daniel) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#6

(#6) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants First Data Merchant Services Corporation, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Merchant Services LLC. (Rickard, Jarrod) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS' CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by First Data Merchant Services Corporation, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Merchant Services LLC re #4 Certificate of Interested Parties,. (Rickard, Jarrod) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#4

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS' CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by First Data Merchant Services Corporation, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Merchant Services LLC re #4 Certificate of Interested Parties,. (Rickard, Jarrod) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 05/09/2019)

3 #1

Index of Exhibits

#3

(#16) ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that #3 defendants' motion to dismiss or alternatively transfer venue be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the matter of La Mojarra Loca, Inc. v. Wells Fargo Merchant Services LLC et al., case number 2:19-cv-00725-JCM-DJA, be, and the same hereby is, TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#2

(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 4/29/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/14/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 04/29/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court for Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-19-790984-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5523745) by Wells Fargo Merchant Services LLC, First Data Merchant Services Corporation now known as First Data Merchant Services LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Semenza, Lawrence) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 04/29/2019)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein for Civil Cause for Initial Conference Hearing held on 1/30/2020: Plaintiff's attorney Daniel Anderson present; Defendant's attorney Matt Knoop and John Peterson present; Case called. OTHER: Motion to be served by 3/2/2020. Opposition to be served by 4/1/2020. Reply to be served and fully briefed motion to be filed with the Court by 4/13/2020. A status conference is scheduled before Judge Feuerstein on 7/13/2020 at 11:15 am. (Cubano, Jazmin) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a change in the Court's calendar, the January 30, 2020 Initial Conference previously scheduled to commence at 11:00 a.m., will commence at 1:00 p.m. (EST), which conference will be conducted telephonically; Plaintiff to initiate the call; once all parties are on the line, contact Chambers at: (631) 712-5630. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 1/28/2020. c/ECF (Killigrew, Patricia) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a change in the Court's calendar, the January 23, 2020 Initial Conference is adjourned to Thursday, January 30, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. (EST), which conference will be conducted telephonically; Plaintiff to initiate the call; once all parties are on the line, contact Chambers at: (631) 712-5630. The parties are reminded they are to appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this SCHEDULING ORDER upon Defendant(s) and file proof of such service with the Court. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 1/22/2020. c/ECF (Killigrew, Patricia) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Defendants ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Wells Fargo Merchant Services, LLC. (Peterson, John) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by John Peterson on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Wells Fargo Merchant Services, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Peterson, John) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 01/23/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein, which conference will be conducted telephonically; Plaintiff to initiate the call; once all parties are on the line, contact Chambers at: (631) 712-5630. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon Defendant(s) and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF (Killigrew, Patricia) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketThe case of La Mojarra Loca, Inc. v. Wells Fargo Merchant Services LLC et al, has been transferred from United States District Court, District of Nevada to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 19-cv-6798-SJF-SIL. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Cox, Dwayne) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:19-cv-00725. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that #3 defendants' motion to dismiss or alternatively transfer venue be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the matter of La Mojarra Loca, Inc. v. Wells Fargo Merchant Services LLC et al., case number 2:19-cv-00725-JCM-DJA, be, and the same hereby is, TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #7 Stipulation by Plaintiff La Mojarra Loca, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Anderson, Daniel) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 6/10/2019 Re: #7 Stipulation. ERROR: Document not filed pursuant to LR IA 6-2 and LR IC 2-2(d) by attorney. Attorney Daniel Anderson is to properly format document #7 with the correct Article 3 Judge listed within the signature box pursuant to the local rules. File the corrected stipulation using the Notice of Corrected Image/Document event and link to document #7 . (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) VIEW #9 corrected image to STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #3 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff La Mojarra Loca, Inc.. (Anderson, Daniel) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants First Data Merchant Services Corporation, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Merchant Services LLC. (Rickard, Jarrod) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS' CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by First Data Merchant Services Corporation, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Merchant Services LLC re #4 Certificate of Interested Parties,. (Rickard, Jarrod) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by First Data Merchant Services Corporation, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Merchant Services LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent First Data Corporation for Wells Fargo Merchant Services LLC; Other Affiliate Wells Fargo Holdings, LLC for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. added. (Rickard, Jarrod) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively Transfer Venue by Defendants First Data Merchant Services Corporation, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Merchant Services LLC. Responses due by 5/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Rickard, Jarrod) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 4/29/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/14/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (JM) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court for Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-19-790984-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5523745) by Wells Fargo Merchant Services LLC, First Data Merchant Services Corporation now known as First Data Merchant Services LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Semenza, Lawrence) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less