This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2020 at 11:15:27 (UTC).

La Liga League, LLC et al v. U90C Management Group, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 La Liga League, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against U90C Management Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00726

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

La Liga League, LLC

Performance Indoor Training Outdoor, LLC

Performance Indoor Training, LLC

Defendants

Dawn L Simpson

Beau Jaussi

Monty D Holloway

U90C Management Group, LLC

The Mareau Group, LLC

Michael Wilson

Dawn L. Simpson

Monty D. Holloway

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy Micah Dortch

Attorney at Potts Law Firm LLP - Dallas

2911 Turtle Creek Blvd, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorneys

John Joseph Mongogna

Attorney at Albin Roach, PLLC - Frisco

5665 Dallas Parkway, Suite 200

Frisco, TX 75034

Jason E Mueller

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

2400 Ross Ave, 24Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#18

(#18) First MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS DAWN L. SIMPSON, MONTY D. HOLLOWAY, MICHAEL WILSON, AND THE MAREAU GROUP, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS by Monty D. Holloway. (Mongogna, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2020: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ). (Entered: 11/11/2020)

17 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#17

(#17) MOTION to Dismiss by Beau Jaussi, U90C Management Group, LLC. (Mueller, Jason) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2020: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ). (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#16

(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Performance Indoor Training Outdoor, LLC, Performance Indoor Training, LLC, La Liga League, LLC. Dawn L. Simpson served on 10/12/2020, answer due 11/11/2020. (Dortch, Timothy) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Performance Indoor Training Outdoor, LLC, Performance Indoor Training, LLC, La Liga League, LLC. The Mareau Group, LLC served on 9/30/2020, answer due 11/11/2020. (Dortch, Timothy) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Performance Indoor Training Outdoor, LLC, Performance Indoor Training, LLC, La Liga League, LLC. U90C Management Group, LLC served on 10/1/2020, answer due 11/11/2020. (Dortch, Timothy) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#13

(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by La Liga League, LLC, Performance Indoor Training Outdoor, LLC, Performance Indoor Training, LLC (Dortch, Timothy) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#12

(#12) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Mareau Group, LLC.( Mongogna, John) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#8

(#8) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Dortch, Timothy) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Issued as to The Mareau Group, LLC. (rpc, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Michael Wilson. (rpc, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Beau Jaussi. (rpc, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Monty D. Holloway. (rpc, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Dawn L. Simpson. (rpc, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to U90C Management Group, LLC. (rpc, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Monty D Holloway, Beau Jaussi, Dawn L Simpson, The Mareau Group, LLC, U90C Management Group, LLC, Michael Wilson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-8021436.), filed by Performance Indoor Training Outdoor, LLC, Performance Indoor Training, LLC, La Liga League, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dortch, Timothy) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) First MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS DAWN L. SIMPSON, MONTY D. HOLLOWAY, MICHAEL WILSON, AND THE MAREAU GROUP, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS by Monty D. Holloway. (Mongogna, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2020: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ). (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Dismiss by Beau Jaussi, U90C Management Group, LLC. (Mueller, Jason) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2020: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ). (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Performance Indoor Training Outdoor, LLC, Performance Indoor Training, LLC, La Liga League, LLC. Dawn L. Simpson served on 10/12/2020, answer due 11/11/2020. (Dortch, Timothy) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Performance Indoor Training Outdoor, LLC, Performance Indoor Training, LLC, La Liga League, LLC. The Mareau Group, LLC served on 9/30/2020, answer due 11/11/2020. (Dortch, Timothy) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Performance Indoor Training Outdoor, LLC, Performance Indoor Training, LLC, La Liga League, LLC. U90C Management Group, LLC served on 10/1/2020, answer due 11/11/2020. (Dortch, Timothy) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by La Liga League, LLC, Performance Indoor Training Outdoor, LLC, Performance Indoor Training, LLC (Dortch, Timothy) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Mareau Group, LLC to 11/11/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, ) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Mareau Group, LLC.( Mongogna, John) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Michael Wilson to 11/11/2020; Monty D. Holloway to 11/11/2020; U90C Management Group, LLC to 11/11/2020; Beau Jaussi to 11/11/2020; Dawn L. Simpson to 11/11/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, ) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Defendants' Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Monty D. Holloway, Beau Jaussi, Dawn L. Simpson, U90C Management Group, LLC, Michael Wilson.( Mongogna, John) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Dortch, Timothy) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Issued as to The Mareau Group, LLC. (rpc, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Michael Wilson. (rpc, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Beau Jaussi. (rpc, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Monty D. Holloway. (rpc, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Dawn L. Simpson. (rpc, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to U90C Management Group, LLC. (rpc, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Monty D Holloway, Beau Jaussi, Dawn L Simpson, The Mareau Group, LLC, U90C Management Group, LLC, Michael Wilson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-8021436.), filed by Performance Indoor Training Outdoor, LLC, Performance Indoor Training, LLC, La Liga League, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dortch, Timothy) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Joseph Mongogna

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason E Mueller