This case was last updated from PACER on 12/14/2020 at 08:14:01 (UTC).

E.L.A. et al v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 E L A filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard A. Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01524

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard A. Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

O. L.C.

E. L.A.

O.L.C.

E.L.A.

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matt Adams

Attorney at NORTHWEST IMMIGRANT RIGHTS PROJECT (SEA)

615 2Nd Ave, Ste 400

Seattle, WA 98104

Aaron Korthuis

Attorney at NORTHWEST IMMIGRANT RIGHTS PROJECT (SEA)

615 2Nd Ave, Ste 400

Seattle, WA 98104

Elizabeth M Chiaviello

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS (HOUSTON)

1000 Louisiana Street, Ste 4000

Houston, TX 77002

Susan Baker Manning

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS (DC)

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Nicholaus Floyd

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS (HOUSTON)

1000 Louisiana Street, Ste 4000

Houston, TX 77002

Margot Adams

Attorney at NORTHWEST IMMIGRANT RIGHTS PROJECT (SEA)

615 2Nd Ave, Ste 400

Seattle, WA 98104

Defendant Attorneys

Kristen R Vogel

Attorney at US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (SEA)

700 Stewart St, Ste 5220

Seattle, WA 98101-1271

Nickolas Bohl

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

700 Stewart Street, Ste 5220

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Margot Adams on behalf of Plaintiffs E.L.A., O.L.C.. (Adams, Margot) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/23/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/30/2020, Joint Status Report due by 12/7/2020, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nickolas Bohl on behalf of Defendant United States of America. (Bohl, Nickolas) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

7 #2

Summons

7 #1

Summons

#7

(#7) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SG) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#4

(#4) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elizabeth M. Chiaviello FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs E. L.A., O. L.C. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6667876 (Adams, Matt) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Susan Baker Manning FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs E. L.A., O. L.C. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6667833 (Adams, Matt) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

2 #1

Proposed Order

#2

(#2) MOTION for Protective Order and to Proceed Under Pseudonyms, filed by Plaintiffs E. L.A., O. L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/30/2020, (Adams, Matt) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

1 #4

Summons Civil Process Clerk

1 #3

Summons DHS

1 #2

Summons Attorney General

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Margot Adams on behalf of Plaintiffs E.L.A., O.L.C.. (Adams, Margot) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: By agreement of the parties, the following deadlines are reset: The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to 1/19/2021. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/26/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/2/2021, Joint Status Report due by 2/9/2021. (VE) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/23/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/30/2020, Joint Status Report due by 12/7/2020, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nickolas Bohl on behalf of Defendant United States of America. (Bohl, Nickolas) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kristen R Vogel on behalf of Defendant United States of America. (Vogel, Kristen) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Nicholaus Floyd for Plaintiffs E.L.A., and O.L.C., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elizabeth M Chiaviello for Plaintiffs E.L.A., and O.L.C., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SG) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketJudge Richard A. Jones added. (SG) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Susan Baker Manning for Plaintiffs E. L.A., and O. L.C., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Nicholaus E. Floyd FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs E. L.A., O. L.C. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6667893 (Adams, Matt) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elizabeth M. Chiaviello FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs E. L.A., O. L.C. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6667876 (Adams, Matt) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Susan Baker Manning FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs E. L.A., O. L.C. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6667833 (Adams, Matt) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Protective Order and to Proceed Under Pseudonyms, filed by Plaintiffs E. L.A., O. L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/30/2020, (Adams, Matt) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-6666888), filed by O. L.C., E. L.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Attorney General, #3 Summons DHS, #4 Summons Civil Process Clerk)(Adams, Matt) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less