This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/06/2020 at 04:06:22 (UTC).

La Clinica De La Raza et al v. Trump et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2019 La Clinica De La Raza filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Trump. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Scott Corley and Phyllis J. Hamilton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04980

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jacqueline Scott Corley

Phyllis J. Hamilton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Maternal and Child Health Access

Central American Resource Center

Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County

Council on American Islamic Relations-California

California Primary Care Association

AFRICAN COMMUNITIES TOGETHER

Farmworker Justice

La Clinica De La Raza

Korean Resource Center

Petitioners

Community Healthcare Network

Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration

Defendants

United States Department of Homeland Security

United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

Kenneth T. Cuccinelli

Kevin K. McAleenan

Donald J. Trump

Amicus Curiae

GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders (GLAD)

Japanese American Citizens League (JACL)

MinKwon Center for Community Action

Women's Bar Association of the District of Columbia

116 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas David Espiritu

Attorney at National Immigration Law Center

3450 Wilshire Blvd #108-62

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Martha Jane Perkins

Attorney at National Health Law Program, Inc.

200 Northgreenboro Street, Suite D-13

Carrboro, NC 20510

Alvaro Moises Huerta

Attorney at National Immigration Law Center

3450 Wilshire Blvd, 108-62

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Antionette Deshun Dozier

Attorney at Western Center on Law and Poverty

3701 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 208

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Tanya Broder

Attorney at National Immigration Law Center

2030 Addison Street, Suite 420

Berkeley, CA 94704

Laboni Amena Hoq

Attorney at Asian Pacific American Legal Center

1145 Wilshire Blvd, 2Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Petitioner Attorneys

Kelly M. Dermody

Attorney at Leiff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

Emily Joanne Nash

Attorney at Foley Hoag LLP

155 Seaport Boulevard

Boston, MA 02210-2600

Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser et al

275 Battery St Fl 29

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

Defendant Attorney

Joshua Michael Kolsky

Attorney at Department of Justice

1100 L Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Amicus Curiae Attorney

Emily Tomoko Kuwahara

Attorney at Crowell and Moring LLP

515 S. Flower Street, 40Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Other Attorneys

Denny W Chan

Attorney at Justice in Aging

3660 Wilshire Blvd, Ste 718

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Owen Masters

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Ave N.W., Suite 600 South

Washington, DC 20004

Christopher Cadena

515 S. Flower St., 40Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Regan M Bailey

Attorney at Justice In Aging

1114 I St. Nw, Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20005

Christian Springer

Attorney at Foley Hoag LLP

1717 K St Nw, Suite 1200

Washington, DC 20006

Russell Laurence Hirschhorn

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

Eleven Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Natalie Elise Kean

Attorney at Justice in Aging

1444 Eye St. Nw, Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20005

Edward Todd Waters

Attorney at Feldesman Tucker Leifer Fidell, LLP

1129 20Th Street N.W., Fourth Floor

Washington, DC 20036

Michael Temple Risher

Attorney at ACLU Foundation of Northern California, Inc.

39 Drumm Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

33 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#154

#153

#152

#151

150 #1

Proposed Order

#150

142 #1

Representation Statement

#142

#142

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

256 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#154) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton: Motion Hearing held on 3/4/2020 re #150 MOTION to Compel Completion of the Administrative Record and Request for Leave to Serve Discovery filed by African Communities Together, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Farmworker Justice, Council on American Islamic Relations-California, Central American Resource Center, Korean Resource Center, La Clinica De La Raza, California Primary Care Association, Maternal and Child Health Access. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/4/2020) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#153) REPLY (re #150 MOTION to Compel Completion of the Administrative Record and Request for Leave to Serve Discovery ) filed byAfrican Communities Together, California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Council on American Islamic Relations-California, Farmworker Justice, Korean Resource Center, La Clinica De La Raza, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Maternal and Child Health Access. (Espiritu, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/19/2020) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#152) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #150 MOTION to Compel Completion of the Administrative Record and Request for Leave to Serve Discovery ) filed byKenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, Donald J. Trump, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 2/12/2020) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#151) ORDER/MANDATE of USCA as to #142 Notice of Appeal,, filed by African Communities Together, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Farmworker Justice, Council on American Islamic Relations-California, Central American Resource Center, Korean Resource Center, La Clinica De La Raza, California Primary Care Association, Maternal and Child Health Access (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2020) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#150) MOTION to Compel Completion of the Administrative Record and Request for Leave to Serve Discovery filed by African Communities Together, California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Council on American Islamic Relations-California, Farmworker Justice, Korean Resource Center, La Clinica De La Raza, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Maternal and Child Health Access. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 2/12/2020. Replies due by 2/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Espiritu, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/29/2020) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#149) Order by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton regarding Administrative Motions to Manually File Administrative Record.Associated Cases: 4:19-cv-04717-PJH, 4:19-cv-04975-PJH, 4:19-cv-04980-PJH(pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2020) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#148) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to Manually File Administrative Record filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, Donald J. Trump, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. Responses due by 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (Kolsky Declaration), #2 Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 1/2/2020) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#147) STIPULATION RE CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE; ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #146 Stipulation. Motions related to discovery and completeness of the administrative record due by 1/29/2020. Response due by 2/12/2020. Reply due by 2/19/2020. Hearing on motions set for 3/4/2020 at 9:00 a.m. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2019) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#146) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Proposed Schedule) filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, Donald J. Trump, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, and All Plaintiffs (Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 12/20/2019) Modified on 12/23/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/23/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#145) Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 10/02/2019 before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton, re #142 Notice of Appeal,, #143 USCA Case Number, Transcript due by 12/19/2019. (Huerta, Alvaro) (Filed on 12/19/2019) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
143 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Kevin K. McAleenan. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Donald J. Trump. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by AFRICAN COMMUNITIES TOGETHER, California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Council on American Islamic Relations-California, Farmworker Justice, Korean Resource Center, La Clinica De La Raza, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Maternal and Child Health Access.. (Espiritu, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/16/2019) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/30/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2019) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Espiritu, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/16/2019) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13617966.). Filed byAFRICAN COMMUNITIES TOGETHER, Maternal and Child Health Access, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Korean Resource Center, California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Farmworker Justice, La Clinica De La Raza, Council on American Islamic Relations-California. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Espiritu, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/16/2019) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Maternal and Child Health Access is a litigant

Latest cases where La Clinica De La Raza is a litigant

Latest cases where MinKwon Center for Community Action is a litigant