This case was last updated from PACER on 06/08/2021 at 10:32:02 (UTC).

L2 Mobile Technologies LLC v. Google LLC

Case Summary

On April 9, 2021, L2 Mobile Technologies LLC (“L2MT”) or (“Plaintiff”), represented by Nicholas A. Brown of Greenberg Traurig LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Google LLC (“Google”) or (“Defendant”), seeking permanent injunctive relief and damages among other reliefs, for alleged unlawful infringement of various United States patents owned by Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the District of California with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding.

 

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,179,913 (“the ’913 patent”), entitled “Method and apparatus of handling variable of RLC Reset procedure during receiver-side-only re-establishment in wireless communications system,” U.S. Patent No. 8,054,777 (“the ’777 patent”), entitled “Method and apparatus for handling control PDUS during re- establishing receiving sides in a wireless communications system,” U.S. Patent No. RE47,200 (“the ’200 patent”), entitled “preventing shortened lifetimes of security keys in a wireless communications security system”, (Collectively “patents-in-suit”).

 

The Plaintiff alleged that Google has infringed patents-in-suit by “(i) designing, manufacturing, offering for sale, and selling the Pixel, Pixel XL, Pixel 2, Pixel 2 XL, Pixel 3, Pixel 3a, Pixel 3a XL, Pixel 3 XL, Pixel 4, Pixel 4 XL, Pixel 4a, Pixel 4a with 5G, and Pixel 5 (the “Accused Instrumentalities”) to such third parties with the knowledge and intent that such devices will be used in accordance with the 3G standard, (ii) enabling retailers and consumer end-users of Accused Instrumentalities to use the products in accordance with at least the 3G standard as disclosed and claimed in the patents-in-suit; (iii) providing instructions to retailers and consumer end-users of  Accused Instrumentalities for using the Accused Instrumentalities in their customary way; (iv) advertising and promoting the Accused Instrumentalities and their compliance with at least the 3G standard; and (v) providing to such third parties the Accused Instrumentalities, including the hardware (e.g., antenna(s), filter(s), switch(es), transceiver(s), and/or baseband processor(s) contained in Accused Instrumentalities) and software components (e.g., operating systems running on Accused Instrumentalities and other software and/or firmware used to operate components of the Accused Instrumentalities) that may be required for or associated with infringement of the patents-in-suit claims, through Defendant’s website and through authorized third-party resellers.”

 

Plaintiff further alleged that  “Upon information and belief that Defendant acted egregiously and with willful misconduct in that its actions constituted direct or indirect infringement of a valid patent, by making, using, selling, offering for sale and/or importing in the United States the Accused Instrumentalities and by inducing the direct infringing use of the Accused Instrumentalities by others, in reckless disregard of L2MT’s patent rights.”

 

In the four claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff, infringement of the Patents-in-suit in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271(a) (b) has been alleged, wherein it has been alleged that Defendant has continued its infringement notwithstanding actual knowledge of the patents-in-suit.

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the court to declare that Patents in Suit are each valid and enforceable; that Patents in Suit have been and are infringed by Defendant; Defendant’s acts of patent infringement relating to the patents are willful; and an award of damages arising out of Defendant’s acts of patent infringement, together with prejudgment and post-judgment interest. Plaintiff further requested the court to grant permanent injunction enjoining Defendant, and pass judgment that the damages so adjudged be trebled in accordance with 35 U.S.C. § 284 along with costs of litigation.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.



Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00358

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

L2 Mobile Technologies LLC

Defendant

Google LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy P. Maloney

Attorney at Fitch, Even, Tabin & Flannery

120 S. Lasalle Street, Suite 2100

Chicago, IL 60603

Joseph F. Marinelli

Attorney at Fitch Even Tabin & Flannery LLP

120 South Lasalle Street, Suite 2100

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorney

Paige Arnette Amstutz

Attorney at Scott, Douglass & McConnico, LLP

303 Colorado Street, Suite 2400

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paige Arnette Amstutz on behalf of Google LLC (Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by L2 Mobile Technologies LLC. Google LLC served on 4/29/2021, answer due 5/20/2021. (Marinelli, Joseph) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#7

(#7) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by L2 Mobile Technologies LLC. (Marinelli, Joseph) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph F. Marinelli on behalf of L2 Mobile Technologies LLC (Marinelli, Joseph) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Google LLC. (lad) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy P. Maloney on behalf of L2 Mobile Technologies LLC (Maloney, Timothy) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Maloney, Timothy) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit 7 - '200 Claim Chart

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - '777 Claim Chart

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - '913 Claim Chart

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Google Phone Specs

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - U.S. Patent No. RE47,200

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 8,054,777

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 8,179,913

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief and Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14683690), filed by L2 Mobile Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 8,179,913, #2 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 8,054,777, #3 Exhibit 3 - U.S. Patent No. RE47,200, #4 Exhibit 4 - Google Phone Specs, #5 Exhibit 5 - '913 Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit 6 - '777 Claim Chart, #7 Exhibit 7 - '200 Claim Chart, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maloney, Timothy) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

9 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paige Arnette Amstutz on behalf of Google LLC (Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by L2 Mobile Technologies LLC. Google LLC served on 4/29/2021, answer due 5/20/2021. (Marinelli, Joseph) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by L2 Mobile Technologies LLC. (Marinelli, Joseph) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph F. Marinelli on behalf of L2 Mobile Technologies LLC (Marinelli, Joseph) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Google LLC. (lad) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy P. Maloney on behalf of L2 Mobile Technologies LLC (Maloney, Timothy) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Maloney, Timothy) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by L2 Mobile Technologies LLC. (Maloney, Timothy) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief and Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14683690), filed by L2 Mobile Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 8,179,913, #2 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 8,054,777, #3 Exhibit 3 - U.S. Patent No. RE47,200, #4 Exhibit 4 - Google Phone Specs, #5 Exhibit 5 - '913 Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit 6 - '777 Claim Chart, #7 Exhibit 7 - '200 Claim Chart, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maloney, Timothy) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paige Arnette Amstutz