This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/30/2021 at 08:07:27 (UTC).

L2 Mobile Technologies LLC v. Ford Motor Company

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 L2 Mobile Technologies LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01409

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

L2 Mobile Technologies LLC

Counter Claimant and Defendant

Ford Motor Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen B. Brauerman

Attorney at Bayard, P.A.

600 N. King Street, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

Joseph F. Marinelli

Ronald P. Golden, III

Attorney at Bayard, P.A.

600 N. King Street, Ste 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

Timothy P. Maloney

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Kenneth Laurence Dorsney

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

Cortlan S. Hitch

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Ave, Ste 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Ford Motor Company. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against L2 Mobile Technologies LLC by Ford Motor Company.(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Respond to Complaint to November 29, 2021 - filed by Ford Motor Company. (Hitch, Cortlan) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on The Corporation Trust Company as Registered Agent for Ford Motor Company on October 7, 2021, filed by L2 Mobile Technologies LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Longhorn IP LLC, Other Affiliate Tanit Ventures, Inc. for L2 Mobile Technologies LLC filed by L2 Mobile Technologies LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy P. Maloney and Joseph F. Marinelli - filed by L2 Mobile Technologies LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

1 #11

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Exhibit 10

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Ford Motor Company. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against L2 Mobile Technologies LLC by Ford Motor Company.(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Respond to Complaint to November 29, 2021 filed by Ford Motor Company. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Ford Motor Company answer due 11/29/2021. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/28/2021. (kmd) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Respond to Complaint to November 29, 2021 - filed by Ford Motor Company. (Hitch, Cortlan) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Joseph F. Marinelli for L2 Mobile Technologies LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (apk) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Timothy P. Maloney for L2 Mobile Technologies LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (apk) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy P. Maloney and Joseph F. Marinelli filed by L2 Mobile Technologies LLC. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/19/2021. (kmd) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on The Corporation Trust Company as Registered Agent for Ford Motor Company on October 7, 2021, filed by L2 Mobile Technologies LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Longhorn IP LLC, Other Affiliate Tanit Ventures, Inc. for L2 Mobile Technologies LLC filed by L2 Mobile Technologies LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy P. Maloney and Joseph F. Marinelli - filed by L2 Mobile Technologies LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (smg) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,179,913 ;7,266,105 ;RE47,200 ;8,054,777 ;8,064,460. (smg) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Ford Motor Company - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3712801.) - filed by L2 Mobile Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(smg) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cortlan S. Hitch

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth Laurence Dorsney