This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/24/2023 at 07:35:25 (UTC).

Kymberly Cardenas et al v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/25/2022 Kymberly Cardenas filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against CVS Pharmacy, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise L. Cote. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-10040

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise L. Cote

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kymberly Cardenas

C.C.

Defendants

CVS Pharmacy Inc

Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.

Walgreen Co., Inc.

Interested Party

Amy M Gernon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mikal Watts

Attorney at Watts Guerra LLP

4 Dominion Drive, Bldg 3, Ste. 100

San Antonio, TX 78257

Defendant Attorneys

Nadine S. Kohane

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

390 Madison Avenue, 12Th Floor, Suite 700

New York, NY 10017

Sarah E. Johnston

Attorney at Barnes and Thornburg LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Kristen Lee Richer

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

2029 Century Park East, Ste 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#35

(#35) AMENDED COMPLAINT against CVS Pharmacy Inc, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., Walgreen Co., Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Kymberly Cardenas, C.C...(Watts, Mikal) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

#55

(#39) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/13/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03043-DLC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#54

RESTRICTED

#53

(#37) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/6/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03043-DLC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#52

RESTRICTED

#33

(#34) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nadine S. Kohane on behalf of CVS Pharmacy Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc, CVS Health Corporation, CVS Health Corp.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03043-DLC et al..(Kohane, Nadine) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

#31

(#32) ORDER TO WITHDRAW AND SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL granting (298) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-md-03043-DLC; granting (31) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-09072-DLC; granting (30) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-09891-DLC; granting (34) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-09994-DLC; granting (31) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-09996-DLC; granting (43) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10020-DLC; granting (34) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10021-DLC; granting (38) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10022-DLC; granting (35) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10023-DLC; granting (82) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10026-DLC; granting (41) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10027-DLC; granting (36) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10029-DLC; granting (29) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10031-DLC; granting (28) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10034-DLC; granting (26) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10036-DLC; granting (31) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10040-DLC; granting (27) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10041-DLC; granting (28) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10042-DLC; granting (25) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10043-DLC; granting (30) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10044-DLC; granting (27) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10045-DLC; granting (31) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10046-DLC. The Court, having considered Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw by Consent and Substitute Counsel find it meritorious and according; IT IS ORDERED that Gerald Singleton of Singleton Schreiber, LLP be withdrawn, and Mikal Watts of Watts Guerra LLC be substituted as lead counsel of record of the above-referenced actions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/29/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03043-DLC et al. (vfr) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

30 #2

Text of Proposed Order to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel

#8

(#33) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Harold Frenchman on behalf of L.N.K. International, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03043-DLC et al..(Frenchman, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#5

(#5) PETITION for Appointment of Kymberly Cardenas as Guardian ad Litem for C.C. filed by Plaintiffs Kymberly Cardenas, Kymberly Cardenas, as Guardian Ad Litem of C.C., Minor. (Singleton, Gerald) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#4

(#4) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Kymberly Cardenas, Kymberly Cardenas, as Guardian Ad Litem of C.C., Minor, identifying Kymberly Cardenas, C.C., Minor, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Singleton, Gerald) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Kymberly Cardenas, Kymberly Cardenas, as Guardian Ad Litem of C.C., Minor. (Singleton, Gerald) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Kymberly Cardenas, Kymberly Cardenas, as Guardian Ad Litem of C.C., Minor. (Singleton, Gerald) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#1

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Kymberly Cardenas, Kymberly Cardenas, as Guardian Ad Litem of C.C., Minor. (Singleton, Gerald) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/26/2022)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/13/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03043-DLC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/13/2023 before Judge Denise L. Cote. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rebecca Forman, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/13/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/23/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/24/2023.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03043-DLC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/6/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03043-DLC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/6/2023 before Judge Denise L. Cote. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sadie Herbert, (212) 805-0310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/13/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/23/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/24/2023.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03043-DLC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) AMENDED COMPLAINT against CVS Pharmacy Inc, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., Walgreen Co., Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Kymberly Cardenas, C.C...(Watts, Mikal) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nadine S. Kohane on behalf of CVS Pharmacy Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc, CVS Health Corporation, CVS Health Corp.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03043-DLC et al..(Kohane, Nadine) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Status Conference held on 1/13/2023. (Court Reporter Rebecca Forman) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03043-DLC et al.(jwh) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Harold Frenchman on behalf of L.N.K. International, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03043-DLC et al..(Frenchman, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER TO WITHDRAW AND SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL granting (298) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-md-03043-DLC; granting (31) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-09072-DLC; granting (30) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-09891-DLC; granting (34) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-09994-DLC; granting (31) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-09996-DLC; granting (43) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10020-DLC; granting (34) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10021-DLC; granting (38) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10022-DLC; granting (35) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10023-DLC; granting (82) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10026-DLC; granting (41) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10027-DLC; granting (36) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10029-DLC; granting (29) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10031-DLC; granting (28) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10034-DLC; granting (26) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10036-DLC; granting (31) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10040-DLC; granting (27) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10041-DLC; granting (28) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10042-DLC; granting (25) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10043-DLC; granting (30) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10044-DLC; granting (27) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10045-DLC; granting (31) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton terminated in case 1:22-cv-10046-DLC. The Court, having considered Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw by Consent and Substitute Counsel find it meritorious and according; IT IS ORDERED that Gerald Singleton of Singleton Schreiber, LLP be withdrawn, and Mikal Watts of Watts Guerra LLC be substituted as lead counsel of record of the above-referenced actions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/29/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03043-DLC et al. (vfr) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Gerald Singleton, New Attorney: Mikal Watts . Document filed by L. J., Jessica Stahlke, J. G. B.P., G. B. P., Yessica Portillo, Jasmine Rios, Farran Elder, N. E. S., E. A., J. G., Tania Osuna, Tania Osuna, as Guardian Ad Litem of S.O., Minor, Ruth Gonzales, G. Q., H. G., David Giddings as Guardian Ad Litem of H.G., Minor, Katie Ritchie, Aide Soriano, Nydia Gonzalez, Tanner Corlett as Guardian Ad Litem of J.F., Minor, Jessica Flores, Erika Avila, Kymberly Cardenas, Crystal Chopin, Miesha Flournoy, Antoinette Gameroz, Natasha Antoinette Gameroz, Angelica Garcia, Lisa Garcia, Nydia Gonzalez, Rishona Richardson, Katie Richie, Angie Ruiz, Aide Soriano, Jessica Stahlke, Tania Osuna, as Guardian Ad Litem of S.O., Minor, Vanessa Valdez, Erika Avila, Maria Avila as Guardian Ad Litem of A.B., Minor, E. R., Enrique Rodriguez Avalos as Guardian Ad Litem of E.R., Minor, L. R., James Patrick as Guardian Ad Litem of N.P., Minor, Miesha Flournoy, S M, Nicole White as Guardian Ad Litem of S.M., Minor, Pernella Booker, as Guardian Ad Litem of K.V., Minor, K. V., Natasha Antoinette Gameroz, Laura Hernandez, Laura Oseguera as Guardian Ad Litem of A.H., Minor, J. M. G., Erik Thompson, as Guardian Ad Litem of C.T., Minor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Gerald Singleton, #2 Text of Proposed Order to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03043-DLC et al..(Watts, Mikal) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PETITION for Appointment of Kymberly Cardenas as Guardian ad Litem for C.C. filed by Plaintiffs Kymberly Cardenas, Kymberly Cardenas, as Guardian Ad Litem of C.C., Minor. (Singleton, Gerald) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Kymberly Cardenas, Kymberly Cardenas, as Guardian Ad Litem of C.C., Minor, identifying Kymberly Cardenas, C.C., Minor, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Singleton, Gerald) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Kymberly Cardenas, Kymberly Cardenas, as Guardian Ad Litem of C.C., Minor. (Singleton, Gerald) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Kymberly Cardenas, Kymberly Cardenas, as Guardian Ad Litem of C.C., Minor. (Singleton, Gerald) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33886756 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Kymberly Cardenas, Kymberly Cardenas, as Guardian Ad Litem of C.C., Minor. (Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton added to party Kymberly Cardenas (pty:pla), Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton added to party Kymberly Cardenas, as Guardian Ad Litem of C.C., Minor(pty:pla))(Singleton, Gerald) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CC is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS Pharmacy, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Walgreen Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant