This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/23/2021 at 07:51:44 (UTC).

Kyles v. Cerner Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 Kyles filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Cerner Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jorge L. Alonso. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05069

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jorge L. Alonso

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jenora Kyles

Defendants

Cerner Corporation

Imprivata, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy Patrick Kingsbury

Attorney at McGuire Law, P.C.

55 W. Wacker Dr., 9Th Fl.

Chicago, IL 60601

Jordan Ruvolo Frysinger

Attorney at Mcguire Law, P.c.

55 W Wacker Dr., 9Th Fl

Chicago, IL 60601

Defendant Attorneys

Erin Bolan Hines

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.

111 South Wacker Drive, Suite 4700

Chicago, IL 60606

Matthew C. Wolfe

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP

111 S. Wacker Drive, Ste. 4700

Chicago, IL 60606

Kateland Jackson

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon Llp

1800 K Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#20

RESTRICTED

#19

(#19) First AMENDED complaint by Jenora Kyles against Cerner Corporation, Imprivata, Inc. (Kingsbury, Timothy) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#18

(#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendant's motion to stay #13 is granted. This case is stayed but not as to service of the new Defendant. The 10/29/21 deadline for Defendant to answer is stricken. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file first amended complaint #16 is granted. The Plaintiff is directed to file the amended complaint as a separate document on the docket. Motion hearing date of 11/5/21 is stricken. Telephonic status hearing previously set for 11/10/21 is stricken and reset to 12/20/21 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiff shall file an updated status report by 12/15/21. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Motion by Timothy Patrick Kingsbury for presentment of motion for leave to file #16 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/5/2021 at 09:30 AM. (Kingsbury, Timothy) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

16 #1

Exhibit A

#16

(#16) MOTION by Plaintiff Jenora Kyles for leave to file First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kingsbury, Timothy) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#15

(#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic motion hearing set for 11/2/21 at 9:30 a.m. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

13 #1

Exhibit A-L to Motion to Stay

#13

(#13) MOTION by Defendant Cerner Corporation to stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-L to Motion to Stay)(Wolfe, Matthew) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (State Court)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on November 2, 2021 before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Order Number: 41977. Court Reporter Contact Information: Annette Montalvo, annette.montalvo@gmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/29/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/9/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/7/2022. (Montalvo, Annette) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Imprivata, Inc. (ng, ) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) First AMENDED complaint by Jenora Kyles against Cerner Corporation, Imprivata, Inc. (Kingsbury, Timothy) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendant's motion to stay #13 is granted. This case is stayed but not as to service of the new Defendant. The 10/29/21 deadline for Defendant to answer is stricken. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file first amended complaint #16 is granted. The Plaintiff is directed to file the amended complaint as a separate document on the docket. Motion hearing date of 11/5/21 is stricken. Telephonic status hearing previously set for 11/10/21 is stricken and reset to 12/20/21 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiff shall file an updated status report by 12/15/21. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Motion by Timothy Patrick Kingsbury for presentment of motion for leave to file #16 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/5/2021 at 09:30 AM. (Kingsbury, Timothy) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION by Plaintiff Jenora Kyles for leave to file First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kingsbury, Timothy) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic motion hearing set for 11/2/21 at 9:30 a.m. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Motion by Matthew C. Wolfe for presentment of motion to stay #13 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/2/2021 at 09:30 AM. (Wolfe, Matthew) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION by Defendant Cerner Corporation to stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-L to Motion to Stay)(Wolfe, Matthew) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to complaint #10 is granted to 10/29/21. Motion hearing date of 10/8/21 is stricken. Telephonic status hearing set for 11/10/21 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 11/5/21. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (jg, ) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jenora Kyles by Jordan Ruvolo Frysinger (Frysinger, Jordan) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jenora Kyles by Timothy Patrick Kingsbury (Kingsbury, Timothy) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cerner Corporation by Kateland Jackson (Jackson, Kateland) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cerner Corporation by Erin Bolan Hines (Hines, Erin) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jf, ) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Cerner Corporation (Wolfe, Matthew) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cerner Corporation by Matthew C. Wolfe (Wolfe, Matthew) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wolfe, Matthew) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2021CH04025) filed by Cerner Corporation Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18704539. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (State Court))(Wolfe, Matthew) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cerner Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew C. Wolfe

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin Bolan Hines