K.W. et al v. Epic Games, Inc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Epic Games, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15547918.). Filed byJillian Williams, K.W.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lord, John) (Filed on 2/8/2021) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Lord, John) (Filed on 2/8/2021) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by K.W., Jillian Williams (Lord, John) (Filed on 2/8/2021) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. Use October 2020 version from https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e- filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Complaint filed by Jillian Williams, K.W. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2021) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Civil Cover Sheet by K.W., Jillian Williams Re: #1 Complaint filed by Jillian Williams, K.W.. (Lord, John) (Filed on 2/8/2021) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/23/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2021) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Epic Games, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2021) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2021) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by K.W., Jillian Williams, Epic Games, Inc. (Lord, John) (Filed on 2/9/2021) Modified on 2/10/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by K.W., Jillian Williams.. (Lord, John) (Filed on 2/10/2021) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2021) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 2/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2021) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE : A Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2021 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2021) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED under Civil L.R. 3-12 filed by K.W., Jillian Williams. Responses due by 2/22/2021. (Lord, John) (Filed on 2/16/2021) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15581971.) filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Jacobson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/16/2021) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Jeffrey S. Jacobson. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #13 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED under Civil L.R. 3-12 ) filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey S. Jacobson In Support of Epic Games, Inc.s Opposition to L.R. 3-12 Administrative Motion to Relate Cases, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jeffrey S. Jacobson In Support of Epic Games, Inc.s Opposition to L.R. 3-12 Administrative Motion to Relate Cases, #3 Proposed Order Denying L.R. 3-12 Administrative Motion to Relate Cases)(Jacobson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related re #13 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED under Civil L.R. 3-12 filed by K.W., Jillian Williams. Responses due by 3/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Reply, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of John E. Lord, #3 Proposed Order)(Lord, John) (Filed on 2/25/2021) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Stay Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Epic Games, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 3/12/2021. Replies due by 3/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey S. Jacobson in Support of Defendant Epic Games, Inc.s Motion to Stay Action, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jeffrey S. Jacobson in Support of Defendant Epic Games, Inc.s Motion to Stay Action, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Jeffrey S. Jacobson in Support of Defendant Epic Games, Inc.s Motion to Stay Action, #4 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Epic Games, Inc.s Motion To Stay)(Jacobson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/26/2021) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #17 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related re #13 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED under Civil L.R. 3-12 ) Epic Games, Inc.s Response to Plaintiffs Administrative Motion For Leave to File Reply filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Jacobson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/1/2021) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Epic Games, Inc. Epic Games, Inc.s Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. and Local Civil Rule 3-15 (Jacobson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/2/2021) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #18 MOTION to Stay Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) filed byK.W., Jillian Williams. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Samuel J. Salario, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Proposed Order)(Lord, John) (Filed on 3/12/2021) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REPLY (re #18 MOTION to Stay Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) Defendant Epic Games, Inc.s Reply In Support of Its Motion to Stay Action filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Jacobson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/15/2021) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Epic Games, Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion to (1) Dismiss for Lack of Standing Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) or, In the Alternative, (2) Compel Individual Arbitration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Epic Games, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 3/29/2021. Replies due by 4/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey S. Jacobson in Support of Defendant Epic Games, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint or, In the Alternative, Compel Individual Arbitration, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jeffrey S. Jacobson in Support of Defendant Epic Games, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint or, In the Alternative, Compel Individual Arbitration, #3 Declaration of John Farnsworth in Support of Defendant Epic Games, Inc.s Motion to (1) Dismiss for Lack of Standing Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) or, In the Alternative, (2) Compel Individual Arbitration, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration of John Farnsworth in Support of Defendant Epic Games, Inc.s Motion to (1) Dismiss for Lack of Standing Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) or, In the Alternative, (2) Compel Individual Arbitration, #5 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Epic Games, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, Compel Individual Arbitration)(Jacobson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/15/2021) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docket(#24) CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION TO STAY (ECF No. 18) AND MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF No. 23) HEARING on April 2, 2021 and April 23, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). Motion Hearing reset for 4/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/crb Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at crbcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than April 20, 2021 at 3:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2021) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #18 Motion to Stay Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #23 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Epic Games, Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion to (1) Dismiss for Lack of Standing Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) or, In the Alternative, (2) Compel Individual Arbitration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2021) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE CASES C-19-3629-YGR and case C-21--0976 CRB by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; terminating #13 Administrative Motion to relate cases. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2021) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Ex Parte Application to Extend Time filed by K.W., Jillian Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Samuel J. Salario, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Lord, John) (Filed on 3/22/2021) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #26 Ex Parte Application to extend time to respond. Motion to Stay and Motion to Dismiss Hearing reset for 4/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #18 MOTION to Stay Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #23 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Epic Games, Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion to (1) Dismiss for Lack of Standing Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) or, In the Alternative, (2) Compel Individual Arbitration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Hearing re #27 Order on Ex Parte Application. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/crb Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required o f counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at crbcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than April 26, 2021 at 3:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2021 10:00 AM in San Fr ancisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Samuel J. Salario, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15784601.) filed by K.W., Jillian Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Salario, Samuel) (Filed on 4/1/2021) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Samuel J. Salario, Jr. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Epic Games, Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion to (1) Dismiss for Lack of Standing Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) or, In the Alternative, (2) Compel Individual Arbitration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) filed byK.W., Jillian Williams. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sanuel J. Salario, Jr., #2 Declaration of K.W.)(Salario, Samuel) (Filed on 4/5/2021) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d Defendant Epic Games, Inc.s Notice of Supplemental Authority Re: Motion to Stay (Dkt. No. 18) filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Related document(s) #18 ) (Jacobson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/6/2021) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Third Party Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents on Motion to Seal filed by C.W.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deepali Brahmbhatt, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A Protective Order, #4 Exhibit B Redacted ECF 21, #5 Supplement Motion to Seal, #6 Declaration of Deepali Brahmbhatt, #7 Proposed Order, #8 Exhibit 1, #9 Exhibit 2, #10 Exhibit 3, #11 Exhibit 4, #12 Exhibit 5, #13 Exhibit 6, #14 Exhibit 7, #15 Exhibit 8, #16 Exhibit 9)(Brahmbhatt, Deepali) (Filed on 4/7/2021) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less