This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 08:44:19 (UTC).

Kutty et al v. US Secretary of State et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Kutty filed a Prisoner - Mandamus lawsuit against US Secretary of State. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph N. Laplante. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00878

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Mandamus

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph N. Laplante

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Khadeeja Ahmed

Ahmed Kutty

Defendants

US Department of Homeland Security

US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director

US Citizenship and Immigration Services

US Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary

US Secretary of State

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Emily Assunta White

Attorney at Shaheen & Gordon PA

180 Bridge St

Manchester, NH 03104

Ronald L. Abramson

Attorney at Shaheen & Gordon PA

180 Bridge St

Manchester, NH 03104

Defendant Attorney

Terry L. Ollila

Attorney at US Attorney's Office (NH)

James C Cleveland Federal Bldg, 53 Pleasant St, 4Th Flr

Concord, NH 03301

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to December 19, 2020 filed by US Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director, US Department of Homeland Security, US Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary, US Secretary of State. Attorney Terry L. Ollila added to party US Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Terry L. Ollila added to party US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director(pty:dft), Attorney Terry L. Ollila added to party US Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Terry L. Ollila added to party US Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary(pty:dft), Attorney Terry L. Ollila added to party US Secretary of State(pty:dft).(Ollila, Terry) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

12 #1

Exhibit -Proof of Service

#12

(#12) Return of Service Executed as to US Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary by Ahmed Kutty, Khadeeja Ahmed. Served/Mailed on 8/24/2020. Answer Follow Up on 9/14/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Proof of Service)(White, Emily) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

11 #1

Exhibit -Proof of Service

#11

(#11) Return of Service Executed as to US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director by Ahmed Kutty, Khadeeja Ahmed. Served/Mailed on 8/28/2020. Answer Follow Up on 9/18/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Proof of Service)(White, Emily) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

1 #12

Summons - Waiver Wolf, OPLA

1 #11

Summons - Waiver Wolf, Office of GC

1 #10

Summons - Waiver Atty Gen William Bar

1 #9

Summons - Waiver USCIS Office of GC

1 #8

Summons - Waiver Pompeo, DOS

1 #7

Summons - Waiver DHS, Office of GC

1 #6

Summons - Waiver Cuccinelli, OPLA

1 #5

Summons - Waiver Cuccinelli, Office of GC

1 #4

Summons - Waiver Civil Process Clerk USAO

1 #3

Exhibit 2--Reply USCIS; DOS

1 #2

Exhibit 1-- I-130 Approval Notice

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-2016177 filed by Ahmed Kutty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-- I-130 Approval Notice, #3 Exhibit 2--Reply USCIS; DOS, #4 Summons - Waiver Civil Process Clerk USAO, #5 Summons - Waiver Cuccinelli, Office of GC, #6 Summons - Waiver Cuccinelli, OPLA, #7 Summons - Waiver DHS, Office of GC, #8 Summons - Waiver Pompeo, DOS, #9 Summons - Waiver USCIS Office of GC, #10 Summons - Waiver Atty Gen William Bar, #11 Summons - Waiver Wolf, Office of GC, #12 Summons - Waiver Wolf, OPLA)(White, Emily) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion to Extend Time to Answer to December 19, 2020 re #1 Complaint. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 12/19/2020. (jb) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to December 19, 2020 filed by US Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director, US Department of Homeland Security, US Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary, US Secretary of State. Attorney Terry L. Ollila added to party US Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Terry L. Ollila added to party US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director(pty:dft), Attorney Terry L. Ollila added to party US Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Terry L. Ollila added to party US Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary(pty:dft), Attorney Terry L. Ollila added to party US Secretary of State(pty:dft).(Ollila, Terry) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Return of Service Executed as to US Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary by Ahmed Kutty, Khadeeja Ahmed. Served/Mailed on 8/24/2020. Answer Follow Up on 9/14/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Proof of Service)(White, Emily) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Return of Service Executed as to US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director by Ahmed Kutty, Khadeeja Ahmed. Served/Mailed on 8/28/2020. Answer Follow Up on 9/18/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Proof of Service)(White, Emily) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Return of Service Executed as to US Department of Homeland Security by Ahmed Kutty, Khadeeja Ahmed. Served/Mailed on 8/24/2020. Answer Follow Up on 9/14/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Proof of Service)(White, Emily) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Return of Service Executed as to US Citizenship and Immigration Services by Ahmed Kutty, Khadeeja Ahmed. Served/Mailed on 8/24/2020. Answer Follow Up on 9/14/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Proof of Service)(White, Emily) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return of Service Executed as to US Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary by Ahmed Kutty, Khadeeja Ahmed. Served/Mailed on 8/24/2020. Answer Follow Up on 9/14/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Proof of Service)(White, Emily) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return of Service Executed as to US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director by Ahmed Kutty, Khadeeja Ahmed. Served/Mailed on 8/24/2020. Answer Follow Up on 9/14/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Proof of Service)(White, Emily) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ronald L. Abramson on behalf of Khadeeja Ahmed, Ahmed Kutty Attorney Ronald L. Abramson added to party Khadeeja Ahmed(pty:pla), Attorney Ronald L. Abramson added to party Ahmed Kutty(pty:pla).(Abramson, Ronald) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return of Service Executed as to US Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director, US Department of Homeland Security, US Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary, US Secretary of State by Ahmed Kutty, Khadeeja Ahmed. Served/Mailed on 8/26/2020. Answer Follow Up on 9/16/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Certified Mail-Return Receipt)(White, Emily) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Return of Service Executed as to US Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director, US Department of Homeland Security, US Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary, US Secretary of State by Ahmed Kutty, Khadeeja Ahmed. Served/Mailed on 8/24/2020. Answer Follow Up on 9/14/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Certified Mail-Return Receipt)(White, Emily) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Return of Service Executed as to US Secretary of State by Ahmed Kutty, Khadeeja Ahmed. Served/Mailed on 8/25/2020. Answer Follow Up on 9/15/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Certified Mail-Return Receipt)(White, Emily) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summonses issued electronically as to US Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director, US Department of Homeland Security, US Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary, US Secretary of State. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-878-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NEW CASE/COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-2016177 filed by Ahmed Kutty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-- I-130 Approval Notice, #3 Exhibit 2--Reply USCIS; DOS, #4 Summons - Waiver Civil Process Clerk USAO, #5 Summons - Waiver Cuccinelli, Office of GC, #6 Summons - Waiver Cuccinelli, OPLA, #7 Summons - Waiver DHS, Office of GC, #8 Summons - Waiver Pompeo, DOS, #9 Summons - Waiver USCIS Office of GC, #10 Summons - Waiver Atty Gen William Bar, #11 Summons - Waiver Wolf, Office of GC, #12 Summons - Waiver Wolf, OPLA)(White, Emily) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. SECRETARY OF STATE is a litigant

Latest cases where US Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases where US Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RONALD ABRAMSON