This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 18:20:03 (UTC).

Kutt v. Apple Inc et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 Kutt filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Apple Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Robert W. Schroeder, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00316

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Rodney Gilstrap

Robert W. Schroeder, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mers Kutt

Defendants

Google Corporation

Storage Post Inc

Seasons Condominiums

Pamela Mary Devins

Dell Inc

Robert Greene

Hewlet Packard Company

International Business Machines Corporation

Amazon.com Inc

Blackberry LTD

Best Buy Co Inc

ASUSTeK Computer Inc

Banking & Trust Company

United States of America Governments

Sony Corporation

Scotiabank

Toshiba Corporation

Mr. Stuart Smith LLP

Lenovo Group Limited

28 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Shaun William Hassett

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP - Dallas

2000 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1400

Dallas, TX 75201

Other Attorneys

Michael Allan Erdmann

Attorney at Jones Day - Dallas

2727 North Harwood Street, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75201-1515

Harry Lee Gillam, Jr

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Tiffany Patrice Cunningham

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP - Chicago

131 S. Dearborn Street, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60603

Matthew Dean Walker

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP - Houston

One Riverway, Suite 1000

Houston, TX 77056

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Scott Wayne Breedlove

Attorney at Carter Arnett PLLC

8150 N. Central Expressway, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75206

Michael E Jones

Attorney at Potter Minton, a Professional Corporation

110 North College Avenue, Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

Kevin Paul Anderson

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP - Washington

505 9Th Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004-2166

 

Court Documents

19 #4

Text of Proposed Order

19 #3

Exhibit 2

19 #2

Exhibit 1

19 #1

Decl. of Ana Williams

#19

#18

17 #2

Text of Proposed Order

17 #1

Exhibit A - Decl. of N. Pous

#17

2 #2

Envelope(s)

2 #1

Letter

#2

1 #5

Envelope(s)

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

US Patent

1 #2

US Patent

1 #1

Attachments

#1

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Decl. of Ana Williams, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tiffany Patrice Cunningham on behalf of Intel Corporation (Cunningham, Tiffany) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Decl. of N. Pous, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(4), 12(b)(5) and 12(b)(6) by AT&T Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Paula Phillips, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Breedlove, Scott) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Against Arm by Arm Holding PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Plaintiff Mailing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Anderson, Kevin) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION to Dismiss (Defendant BlackBerry Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) and 12(b)(5)) by Blackberry LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geng, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hassett, Shaun) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by Travelers Companies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Case No. 1:12-cv-1489 (E.D. Va. dismissed Feb. 20, 2013)), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Matthew) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Dean Walker on behalf of Travelers Companies Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Walker, Matthew) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum in Support by Jones Day. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2013.02.20 E.D. Va. Order, #2 Exhibit 2-2015.12.17 E.D. Va. Order, #3 Exhibit 3-2017.01.24 E.D. Va. Order, #4 Exhibit 4-2016.02.05 U.S. Ct. App. Fed. Cir. Order, #5 Exhibit 5-S. Suchy Decl., #6 Exhibit 6-Kutt Sent Priority Mail Env (Exhibit A S. Suchy Decl., #7 Exhibit 7-Kutt Sent Complaint and Attachments (Exhibit B S. Suchy Decl., #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Erdmann, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Answer Due Deadline Updated for Apple Inc to 11/18/2019; Intel Corporation to 11/18/2019. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by Intel Corporation re #4 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to Pro Se Plaintiff's Complaint (Gillam, Harry) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Per Conversation with Mr. Mers Kutt on 10/17/2019, an alternate e-mail address was provided to the court: mk@merskutt.com (klc, ) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/16/2019. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Opposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Intel Corporation's Opposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to Pro Se Plaintiff's Complaint by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Rodney Gilstrap recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/10/2019. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope(s))(nkl, ) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 6-49203. (mjc, ) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mers Kutt. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 US Patent, #3 US Patent, #4 Exhibit)(ch, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2019: #5 Envelope(s)) (ch, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2019: #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (nkl, ). (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scotiabank is a litigant

Latest cases where Asustek Computer Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Dell Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SONY CORPORATION OF AMERICA is a litigant