This case was last updated from PACER on 11/01/2020 at 09:44:18 (UTC).

Kurth, Scott v. Saul, Andrew

Case Summary

On 09/02/2020 Kurth, Scott filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul, Andrew. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Peter A. Oppeneer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00809

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Peter A. Oppeneer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott Kurth

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dana W. Duncan

Attorney at Duncan Disability Law, SC

555 Birch Street, P.O. Box 217

Nekoosa, WI 54457

Defendant Attorneys

Albert Bianchi, Jr.

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

222 W. Washington Avenue, Ste. 700

Madison, WI 53703

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney at Office of General Counsel

200 West Adams Street, 30Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Megan Hugo

Attorney at Social Security Administration

600 West Madison Street, 6Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60661-2474

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Megan Hugo for Defendant Andrew Saul. (Hugo, Megan) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Andrew Saul served on 9/11/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. (Duncan, Dana) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. Materials returned to plaintiff's counsel for service. (kwf) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • Docket(#3) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** From the affidavit of indigency plaintiff has submitted, I find that plaintiff is unable to prepay the fees and costs of commencing this action or to give security therefor. Accordingly, plaintiff's petition for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee is granted. The clerk of court shall issue summonses and forward them to plaintiff's counsel for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/4/2020. (kwf) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketStandard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (kwf) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Scott Kurth. (Duncan, Dana) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul., filed by Scott Kurth. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Duncan, Dana) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less