This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2019 at 11:47:35 (UTC).

Kurk, et al v. Los Rios Classified Employees Association, et al

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 Kurk, filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Los Rios Classified Employees Association,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly J. Mueller and Deborah Barnes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00548

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly J. Mueller

Referral Judge

Deborah Barnes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Susan Shroll

Kristine Kurk

Defendants

John Knight

Los Rios Classified Employees Association

Los Rios Community College District

Xavier Becerra

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mariah Rose Gondeiro

Karin Moore Sweigart

Defendant Attorneys

Spencer Elgant Covert, Jr.

Monique Alonso

Maureen C. Onyeagbako

 

Court Documents

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#19

#18

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #3

VDRP

3 #2

Consent Form

3 #1

Standing Order

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Defendants Service Employees International Union Local 620 ("SEIU Local 620"), San Luis Coastal Unified School District, and Eric Prater are DISMISSED, without prejudice, as provided by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (ECF No. #23 ). (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: In light of Defendant Los Rios Classified Employees Association's Answer (ECF No. #24 ), the Stipulation and Proposed Order for Extension of Time (ECF No. #22 ) is DENIED as MOOT. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ANSWER by Xavier Becerra.(Onyeagbako, Maureen) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER by Los Rios Classified Employees Association.(Alonso, Monique) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Susan Shroll. (Sweigart, Karin) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Second Extension to File Responsive Pleading by Los Rios Classified Employees Association. (Alonso, Monique) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/20/19 ORDERING Defendant Los Rios Community College District's Non-opposition and Release From Costs and Fees. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Defendants' Proposed Attorney Substitutions filed at ECF Nos. #18 , and #19 are GRANTED. Accordingly, Attorney Spencer E. Covert, Jr. is SUBSTITUTED as counsel of record for Defendants Los Rios Community College District and John Knight, in place of Attorney Jesse J. Maddox. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by John Knight. (Covert, Spencer) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Los Rios Community College District. (Covert, Spencer) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to San Luis Coastal Unified School District on 3/29/2019, Answer due 5/28/2019 (Sweigart, Karin) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Xavier Becerra on 3/29/2019, Answer due 5/28/2019 (Sweigart, Karin) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to John Knight on 3/29/2019, Answer due 5/28/2019 (Sweigart, Karin) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Los Rios Community College District on 3/29/2019, Answer due 5/28/2019 (Sweigart, Karin) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Los Rios Classified Employees Association. Attorney Alonso, Monique added. (Alonso, Monique) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Los Rios Classified Employees Association on 3/29/2019, Answer due 5/28/2019 (Gondeiro, Mariah) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Service Employees International Union Local 620 on 3/29/2019, Answer due 5/28/2019 (Gondeiro, Mariah) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/1/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Xavier Becerra, John Knight, Los Rios Classified Employees Association, Los Rios Community College District, Eric Prater, San Luis Coastal Unified School District, Service Employees International Union Local 620* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mariah Rose Gondeiro* *Freedom Foundation* *50 Woodside Plaza, #710* *Redwood City, CA 94061-2500*. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Susan Shroll, Kristine Kurk. Attorney Gondeiro, Mariah Rose added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8184373) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gondeiro, Mariah) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less