This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 04:34:49 (UTC).

KUPPERMAN v. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U.S.A. et al

Case Summary

On 10/25/2019 KUPPERMAN filed an Other lawsuit against HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U S A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard J. Leon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03224

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard J. Leon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHARLES M KUPPERMAN

CHARLES M. KUPPERMAN

Petitioners

CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC.

NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY

DOW JONES & COMPANY, INC.

REUTERS NEWS & MEDIA INC.

WP CO., LLC

NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA, LLC.

CBS BROADCASTING INC.

POLITICO LLC

JOHN MICHAEL MULVANEY

ASSOCIATED PRESS

WP CO., LLC doing business as WASHINGTON POST

Defendants

HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U.S.A.

CAROLYN B. MALONEY

NANCY PELOSI

ADAM SCHIFF

ELIOT ENGEL

DONALD J. TRUMP

UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles Justin Cooper

Attorney at COOPER & KIRK, PLLC

1523 New Hampshire Ave, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Michael W. Kirk

Attorney at COOPER & KIRK, PLLC

1523 New Hampshire Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Jose Joel Alicea

Attorney at COOPER & KIRK, PLLC

1523 New Hampshire Ave, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Petitioner Attorneys

Matthew E. Kelley

Attorney at BALLARD SPAHR LLP

1909 K Street, Nw, 12Th Floor

Washington, DC 20006

William Bullock Pittard, IV

Attorney at KAISER DILLON, PLLC

1099 14Th Street, Suite 800 West

Washington, DC 20005

Christopher C. Muha

Attorney at KAISER DILLON, PLLC

1099 14Th Street, Suite 800 West

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel F. Jacobson

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Douglas N. Letter

Attorney at U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

Elisabeth S. Theodore

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

601 Massachusetts Ave. Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Sally Pei

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Josephine T. Morse

Attorney at U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

Robert Stanton Jones

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

601 Massachusetts Ave, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Todd Barry Tatelman

Attorney at U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

Adam Anderson Grogg

Attorney at U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

Steven A. Myers

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

1100 L Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Andrew Marshall Bernie

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

1100 L Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Cristen Cori Handley

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

1100 L Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

James Mahoney Burnham

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

James J. Gilligan

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

1100 L Street, Nw, Room 11200

Washington, DC 20005

Elizabeth J. Shapiro

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

1100 L Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#61

(#61) RESPONSE re #60 Notice (Other) filed by CHARLES M. KUPPERMAN. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

60 #1

Exhibit 1

#60

(#60) NOTICE by ELIOT ENGEL, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#59

RESTRICTED

41 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#41

(#54) REPLY to opposition to motion re #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss filed by ELIOT ENGEL, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

40 #3

Text of Proposed Order

40 #1

Statement of Facts

#40

(#56) REPLY to opposition to motion re #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment (Reply in Support of Defendant President Donald J. Trump's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment) filed by DONALD J. TRUMP. (Gilligan, James) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #10

Summons

1 #8

Summons

1 #7

Summons

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

107 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) RESPONSE re #60 Notice (Other) filed by CHARLES M. KUPPERMAN. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) NOTICE by ELIOT ENGEL, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on December 10, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-68. Date of Issuance: December 11, 2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from t he court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 1/1/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/11/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2020.(wz) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Entry for Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Motions Hearing held on 12/10/2019 re: #40 #41 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. The #40 #41 Motions were Heard and Taken Under Advisement. (Court Reporter: William P. Zaremba) (jth) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • MINUTE ORDER. At tomorrow's hearing, the Court will hear argument on issues of justiciability. Specifically, the Court directs the parties to focus on mootness and standing. Each of the three parties will have twenty minutes to argue, and defendants may each reserve up to five minutes of their twenty for rebuttal. In light of the parties' extensive and thoughtful briefing, the Court will not require the parties to address the merits tomorrow. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/9/2019. (lcrjl2) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) NOTICE of Appearance by Elisabeth S. Theodore on behalf of ELIOT ENGEL, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Theodore, Elisabeth) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) NOTICE by DONALD J. TRUMP re #56 Reply to opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Reply)(Handley, Cristen) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) REPLY to opposition to motion re #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment (Reply in Support of Defendant President Donald J. Trump's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment) filed by DONALD J. TRUMP. (Gilligan, James) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) Memorandum in opposition to re #43 MOTION to Modify ADD THE HONORABLE PAUL D. IRVING AS CO-DEFENDANT filed by ELIOT ENGEL, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) REPLY to opposition to motion re #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss filed by ELIOT ENGEL, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Cristen Cori Handley on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP (Handley, Cristen) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Marshall Bernie on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP (Bernie, Andrew) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Myers on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP (Myers, Steven) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by James Mahoney Burnham on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP (Burnham, James) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • MINUTE ORDER. Due to the time-sensitive nature of the issues raised in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that a status conference is set for October 31, 2019, at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. It is further ORDERED that plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Minute Order on all defendants named in the complaint, and that counsel for each defendant shall enter an appearance as soon as possible in advance of the status conference. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/28/2019. (lcrjl2) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/28/2019. (lcrjl2) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to ELIOT ENGEL, HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U.S.A., CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zmc) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Kirk on behalf of CHARLES M KUPPERMAN (Kirk, Michael) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6481004) filed by CHARLES M KUPPERMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POLITICO LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where House of Representatives is a litigant

Latest cases where ASSOCIATED PRESS MEDIA EDITORS is a litigant