This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/02/2019 at 07:53:48 (UTC).

KUPERSMIT v. IRS/CIR et al

Case Summary

On 09/03/2019 KUPERSMIT filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against IRS/CIR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tonianne J. Bongiovanni and Freda L. Wolfson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-17580

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tonianne J. Bongiovanni

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARBARA A. KUPERSMIT

Yardley, PA 19067

Defendants

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

COMMONWEALTH BUREAU OF INDIVIDUAL TAXES

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO.

STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY

VERIZON

WELLS FARGO BANK

IRS/CIR

CITIZENS BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

WILLIAM JOSEPH MARTIN

Attorney at MARTIN, GUNN & MARTIN

216 Haddon Avenue, Suite 420

Westmont, NJ 08108

ROBERT T. PINDULIC

Attorney at WHITE & WILLIAMS LLP

1037 Raymond Blvd., Suite 130

Newark, NJ 07102-5415

AARON M. BENDER

Attorney at REED SMITH

136 Main Street, Suite 250, Princeton Forrestal Village

Princeton, NJ 08540

DIANE A. BETTINO

Attorney at REED SMITH, LLP

136 Main Street, Suite 250

Princeton, NJ 08540

 

Court Documents

18 #10

Proof of Service

18 #9

Exhibit Exhibit C

18 #8

Exhibit Exhibit B

18 #5

Brief Memorandum of Law

18 #4

Index Table of Authorities

18 #3

Index Table of Contents

18 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet

18 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#18

6 #1

Envelope

6 #14

5 #1

Envelope

#5

#4

#3

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Summons

#1

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO.. Responses due by 11/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #3 Index Table of Contents, #4 Index Table of Authorities, #5 Brief Memorandum of Law, #6 Certification Certification of Counsel, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit Exhibit C, #10 Proof of Service)(MARTIN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 12/2/2019 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION to Dismiss by CITIZENS BANK. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(BETTINO, DIANE) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk`s Text Order - The document #16 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CITIZENS BANK has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/29/2019. (abr) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Citizens Bank.. (BETTINO, DIANE) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by DIANE A. BETTINO on behalf of CITIZENS BANK (BETTINO, DIANE) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 11/18/2019 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY identifying State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as Corporate Parent.. (PINDULIC, ROBERT) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Dismiss by STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY. Responses due by 11/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(PINDULIC, ROBERT) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION for Entry of Default and Summary Judgment. Motion set for 11/18/2019 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (BENDER, AARON) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by AARON M. BENDER on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK (BENDER, AARON) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Copy of Letter regarding an Appeal Notice to the Department of the Treasury from Barbara A. Kupersmit and Harold P. Kupersmit. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jem) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Copy of Declaratory Judgment sent to U.S. Supreme Court from Barbara A. Kupersmit and Harold P. Kupersmit. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jem) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Submission received by BARBARA A. KUPERSMIT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jdb) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, CITIZENS BANK, COMMONWEALTH BUREAU OF INDIVIDUAL TAXES, IRS/CIR, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO., STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY, VERIZON, WELLS FARGO BANK. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number TRE105870 (abr) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Civil Cover Sheet filed BARBARA A. KUPERSMIT. (jem) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. Sent via USPS on 9/4/2019. (jdb) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Envelope)(jdb) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITIZENS BANK N A is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Insurance is a litigant

Latest cases where Verizon Communications Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant