This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/06/2023 at 09:11:57 (UTC).

Kunst v. Lockheed Martin Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/08/2022 Kunst filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Lockheed Martin Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William F. Jung and Sean P. Flynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-02788

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William F. Jung

Referral Judge

Sean P. Flynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Kunst

Defendant

Lockheed Martin Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andres Kroboth

Noah E. Storch

Defendant Attorneys

Laura E. Prather

Chase Hunter Hale

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Lockheed Martin Corporation. (JNB) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by David Kunst. Related case(s): Yes (Storch, Noah) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by David Kunst. (Storch, Noah) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Noah E. Storch on behalf of David Kunst. Lead Counsel: Noah E. Storch. (Storch, Noah) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Andres Kroboth on behalf of David Kunst (Kroboth, Andres) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#10

(#10) RETURN of service executed on 12/9/22 by David Kunst as to Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Storch, Noah) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

#11

(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Hale, Chase) Modified text on 12/27/2022 (SET). (Entered: 12/27/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Laura E. Prather on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation. Lead Counsel: Laura E. Prather. (Prather, Laura) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lockheed Martin Corporation. Related case(s): No (Prather, Laura) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#15

(#15) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 4 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule, by Lockheed Martin Corporation identifying Corporate Parent State Street Corporation for Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Prather, Laura) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#16

(#16) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint, by Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Prather, Laura) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#17

(#17) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Hale, Chase) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

#18

(#18) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive motions due by 2/29/2024. Pretrial statement due by 7/4/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/11/2024 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Jury Trial set for 8/5/2024 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Conduct mediation hearing by 1/26/2024. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 1/31/2023. (CAH) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive motions due by 2/29/2024. Pretrial statement due by 7/4/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/11/2024 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Jury Trial set for 8/5/2024 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Conduct mediation hearing by 1/26/2024. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 1/31/2023. (CAH) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Hale, Chase) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint, by Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Prather, Laura) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 4 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule, by Lockheed Martin Corporation identifying Corporate Parent State Street Corporation for Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Prather, Laura) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lockheed Martin Corporation. Related case(s): No (Prather, Laura) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Laura E. Prather on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation. Lead Counsel: Laura E. Prather. (Prather, Laura) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Lockheed Martin Corporation's answer or response due 1/13/2023. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/28/2022. (CCB) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Hale, Chase) Modified text on 12/27/2022 (SET). (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN of service executed on 12/9/22 by David Kunst as to Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Storch, Noah) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Andres Kroboth on behalf of David Kunst (Kroboth, Andres) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Noah E. Storch on behalf of David Kunst. Lead Counsel: Noah E. Storch. (Storch, Noah) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by David Kunst. (Storch, Noah) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by David Kunst. Related case(s): Yes (Storch, Noah) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Lockheed Martin Corporation. (JNB) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:22-cv-2788-WFJ-SPF. (SJB) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Lockheed Martin Corporation with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20281559) filed by David Kunst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Storch, Noah) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less