This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/09/2021 at 10:02:34 (UTC).

Kunkle v. ValueVision Media, Inc. Executives' Severance Benefit Plan et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2020 Kunkle filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against ValueVision Media, Inc Executives' Severance Benefit Plan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric C. Tostrud and Becky R. Thorson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-02526

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric C. Tostrud

Referral Judge

Becky R. Thorson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nancy E. Kunkle

Defendants

ValueVision Media, Inc. Executives' Severance Benefit Plan

iMedia Brands, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen C Kunkle

Katherine L MacKinnon

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Nancy E. Kunkle. ValueVision Media, Inc. Executives' Severance Benefit Plan waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. (Kunkle, Stephen) Modified text on 1/26/2021 (CLK). Modified text on 1/26/2021 (CLK). (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Nancy E. Kunkle. iMedia Brands, Inc. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. (Kunkle, Stephen) Modified text on 1/26/2021 (CLK). Modified text on 1/26/2021 (CLK). (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Stephen C Kunkle for Nancy E. Kunkle. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/6/2021. (NAH) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephen Kunkle. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8353160 filed by Nancy E. Kunkle. (MacKinnon, Katherine) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to ValueVision Media, Inc. Executives' Severance Benefit Plan, iMedia Brands, Inc. (MKB) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 20-cv-2526 (ECT/BRT). (MKB) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8303480) filed by Nancy E. Kunkle. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MacKinnon, Katherine) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less