This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2020 at 15:50:15 (UTC).

Kuna v. Safko et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2020 Kuna filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Safko. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jodi W. Dishman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00513

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jodi W. Dishman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amberli Kuna

Defendants

Wolf Dale Safko

Oklahoma County Sheriff Office

Oklahoma County Board of County Commissioners

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

M Michael Arnett

Defendant Attorneys

Carri A Remillard

Rodney J Heggy

Aaron C Etherington

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma (OKWD) is upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, August 3, 2020. Complete information regarding the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF implementation is available at #http://www.okwd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-information.****Currently, you may share a single PACER account with other attorneys in your firm. With the new OKWD NextGen CM/ECF system, sharing of individual PACER accounts is prohibited. You must have an individual upgraded PACER account linked to your e-filing account. Once again, shared PACER accounts cannot be used by OKWD e-filing attorneys. ****Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one is to upgrade your PACER account and step two is to link your upgraded PACER account to the OKWD e-filing account in the upgraded NextGen CM/ECF system. This notice only addresses the first step because the second step cannot be completed until on or after August 3, 2020. ****Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. The first step is to determine whether you have an "Upgraded" PACER account. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on August 3, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If neither of these is true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you can link your PACER account to your new NextGen CM/ECF account. ****OKWDs current CM/ECF system will NOT be available from 11:00 AM on 07/31/20 until 8:00 AM on 08/03/20 due to the upgrade. ****Additional notices will be sent at a later date regarding the second step of this process. If you have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the OKWD Clerk's Office CM/ECF Help Desk at 405-609-5555. (Pigott, William) (ADI) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amberli Kuna. Wolf Dale Safko served on 7/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Arnett, M) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss and Special Appearance filed by Amberli Kuna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tort Notice, #2 Exhibit Domestic Return Receipt)(Arnett, M) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amberli Kuna. Oklahoma County Sheriff Office served on 6/4/2020. (Arnett, M) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amberli Kuna. Oklahoma County Board of County Commissioners served on 6/4/2020. (Arnett, M) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Rodney J Heggy on behalf of Oklahoma County Board of County Commissioners, Oklahoma County Sheriff Office (Heggy, Rodney) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Aaron C Etherington on behalf of Oklahoma County Board of County Commissioners, Oklahoma County Sheriff Office (Etherington, Aaron) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss and Special Appearance by Oklahoma County Board of County Commissioners, Oklahoma County Sheriff Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Affidavit of Hooten)(Remillard, Carri) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Carri A Remillard on behalf of Oklahoma County Board of County Commissioners, Oklahoma County Sheriff Office (Remillard, Carri) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3164590. (Arnett, M) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Oklahoma County Board of County Commissioners, Oklahoma County Sheriff Office, Wolf Dale Safko. (em) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Oklahoma County Board of County Commissioners, Oklahoma County Sheriff Office, Wolf Dale Safko filed by Amberli Kuna. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(em) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less