This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2019 at 07:04:05 (UTC).

KULAKOV v. ION TRADING, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2019 KULAKOV filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against ION TRADING, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is R. BARCLAY SURRICK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02977

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. BARCLAY SURRICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALEXANDER KULAKOV

Defendants

TRIPLE POINT TECHNOLOGY, INC.

ION TRADING, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANE SCHIFF

Attorney at CONSOLE MATTIACCI LAW, LLC

1525 Locust St 9Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorneys

JARED PICKELL

Attorney at Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC

50 S. 16Th Street, Suite 3200

Philadelphia, PA 19102-2555

LARRY BESNOFF

Attorney at Buchanan & Ingersoll PC

Two Liberty Place, 50 South 16Th Street, Suite 3200

Phila, PA 19103-3086

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Triple Point Intermediate Holdings, Inc.; ION Trading UK Limited with Certificate of Service by ION TRADING, INC., TRIPLE POINT TECHNOLOGY, INC..(PICKELL, JARED) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALEXANDER KULAKOV. TRIPLE POINT TECHNOLOGY, INC. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (SCHIFF, LANE) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALEXANDER KULAKOV. ION TRADING, INC. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (SCHIFF, LANE) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JARED PICKELL on behalf of ION TRADING, INC., TRIPLE POINT TECHNOLOGY, INC. with Certificate of Service(PICKELL, JARED) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by LARRY BESNOFF on behalf of ION TRADING, INC., TRIPLE POINT TECHNOLOGY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BESNOFF, LARRY) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ION TRADING, INC., TRIPLE POINT TECHNOLOGY, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13656176.), filed by ALEXANDER KULAKOV.(SCHIFF, LANE) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Triple Point Intermediate Holdings, Inc.; ION Trading UK Limited with Certificate of Service by ION TRADING, INC., TRIPLE POINT TECHNOLOGY, INC..(PICKELL, JARED) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALEXANDER KULAKOV. TRIPLE POINT TECHNOLOGY, INC. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (SCHIFF, LANE) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALEXANDER KULAKOV. ION TRADING, INC. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (SCHIFF, LANE) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JARED PICKELL on behalf of ION TRADING, INC., TRIPLE POINT TECHNOLOGY, INC. with Certificate of Service(PICKELL, JARED) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by LARRY BESNOFF on behalf of ION TRADING, INC., TRIPLE POINT TECHNOLOGY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BESNOFF, LARRY) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ALEXANDER KULAKOV. (jwl, ) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Summons Issued as to ION TRADING, INC., TRIPLE POINT TECHNOLOGY, INC.. Two Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/9/19 (jwl, ) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ION TRADING, INC., TRIPLE POINT TECHNOLOGY, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13656176.), filed by ALEXANDER KULAKOV.(SCHIFF, LANE) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.