This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/20/2022 at 22:06:33 (UTC).

Kuklineski v. Binance Capital Management Co., Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 Kuklineski filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Binance Capital Management Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen P. McGlynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01425

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen P. McGlynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kamil Kuklineski

Kamil Kuklinski

Defendants

Binance Capital Management Co., Ltd. doing business as Binance

BAM Trading Services Inc. doing business as Binance.US

Jumio Corporation

Binance Capital Management Co., Ltd. d/b/a Binance

BAM Trading Services Inc. d/b/a Binance.US

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joel D. Beckwith

Attorney at Freeark, Dennis, Murphy & Moskop, P.C.

115 West Washington Street, P.O. Box 546

Belleville, IL 62222-0546

Katrina Carroll

Attorney at Lynch Carpenter, LLP

111 W. Washington Street, Suite 1240

Chicago, IL 60602

Shane M. Moskop

Attorney at Freeark, Dennis, Murphy & Moskop, P.C.

115 West Washington Street, P.O. Box 546

Belleville, IL 62222-0546

Defendant Attorneys

Ezekiel L. Hill

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

1900 N. Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Daniel P. Roeser

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

620 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10018

Susan Fahringer

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP - Seattle

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Anna Mouw Thompson

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP - Seattle

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Debra R. Bernard

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP - Chicago

110 North Wacker Dr., Suite 3400

Chicago, IL 60606

Nicola Menaldo

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP - Seattle

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Alexander Southwell

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP

200 Park Avenue, 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

Jacob Kahn

Attorney at Riley Safer Holmes, et al

Three First National Plaza, 70 West Madison Street

Chicago, IL 60602

Brendan R. Blake

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

100 Northern Avenue

Boston, MA 02210

Megan D. Bettles

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

Three Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#69

(#69) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Stephen P. McGlynn. Joint Report of the Parties due seven days before the conference. The parties are reminded that the proposed discovery, mediation and dispositive motions deadlines must be in compliance with the requirements set forth in this Court's form order. See also SDIL-LR 7.1(f) and Timetable. Instructions to join the phone conference are as follows: Call toll free 1-888-684-8852, when prompted enter access code 6102338, when prompted enter the four-digit security code 9374. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 5/17/2022. (jsm2) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#68

(#68) CJRA TRACK D assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2024 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge Stephen P. McGlynn. Presumptive Jury Trial month February 2024. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 5/17/2022. (jsm2) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#67

(#67) MANDATORY MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 5/17/2022. (jsm2) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#66

(#66) REPLY to Response to Motion re #53 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT) Reply in Support of Jumio's Motion to Dismiss 1st Amended Complaint filed by Jumio Corporation. (Fahringer, Susan) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

53 #5

Exhibit E

53 #4

Exhibit D

53 #3

Exhibit C

53 #2

Exhibit B

53 #1

Exhibit A

53 #53

Main Document

#8

(#10) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court is in receipt of #8 Stipulation. By agreement, the deadline for BAM Trading Services, Inc. and Jumio Corporation to respond to Plaintiffs complaint is January 10, 2022. Additionally, neither BAM nor Jumio waive any of their rights or defenses by this Stipulation. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 11/22/2021. (jce) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Debra R. Bernard on behalf of Jumio Corporation (Bernard, Debra) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAM Trading Services Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BAM Management Holdings, Inc. for BAM Trading Services Inc.. (Roeser, Daniel) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#3

(#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel P. Roeser and granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ezekiel L. Hill on behalf of BAM Trading Services Inc. (clt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#2

(#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel P. Roeser and granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ezekiel L. Hill on behalf of BAM Trading Services Inc. (clt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/15/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Action Filings

1 #1

Main Document

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Stephen P. McGlynn. Joint Report of the Parties due seven days before the conference. The parties are reminded that the proposed discovery, mediation and dispositive motions deadlines must be in compliance with the requirements set forth in this Court's form order. See also SDIL-LR 7.1(f) and Timetable. Instructions to join the phone conference are as follows: Call toll free 1-888-684-8852, when prompted enter access code 6102338, when prompted enter the four-digit security code 9374. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 5/17/2022. (jsm2) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) CJRA TRACK D assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2024 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge Stephen P. McGlynn. Presumptive Jury Trial month February 2024. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 5/17/2022. (jsm2) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) MANDATORY MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 5/17/2022. (jsm2) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) REPLY to Response to Motion re #53 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT) Reply in Support of Jumio's Motion to Dismiss 1st Amended Complaint filed by Jumio Corporation. (Fahringer, Susan) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) REPLY to Response to Motion re #55 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by BAM Trading Services Inc.. (Roeser, Daniel) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) REPLY to Response to Motion re #54 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Binance Capital Management Co., Ltd.. (Kahn, Jacob) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #54 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Kamil Kuklinski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Beckwith, Joel) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #53 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT) filed by Kamil Kuklinski. (Beckwith, Joel) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #55 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by All Plaintiffs. (Beckwith, Joel) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) ORDER granting #59 Motion for Extension of Time. For good cause, response date is extended to April 29, 2022 for pending motions to dismiss (Docs. #53 , #54 , #55 , and #59 ). (Responses due by 4/29/2022). Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 3/24/2022. (jce) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. Modified on 4/4/2022 to remove bold font (jce). (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court is in receipt of #8 Stipulation. By agreement, the deadline for BAM Trading Services, Inc. and Jumio Corporation to respond to Plaintiffs complaint is January 10, 2022. Additionally, neither BAM nor Jumio waive any of their rights or defenses by this Stipulation. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 11/22/2021. (jce) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #8 Stipulation filed by BAM Trading Services Inc. When pleadings contain multiple attorney signatures, the non-filing attorneymust include the language with consent with his/her signature. See Section 2.1 of the CM/ECF Users Manual. This notice is for informational purposes andtherefore no action is required. (clt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION Regarding Deadline for Response to Complaint by BAM Trading Services Inc.. (Roeser, Daniel) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Debra R. Bernard on behalf of Jumio Corporation (Bernard, Debra) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel P. Roeser and granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ezekiel L. Hill on behalf of BAM Trading Services Inc. (clt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stephen P. McGlynn assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-01425-SPM. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (clt) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAM Trading Services Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BAM Management Holdings, Inc. for BAM Trading Services Inc.. (Roeser, Daniel) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ezekiel L. Hill $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-4632004 by on behalf of BAM Trading Services Inc.. (Hill, Ezekiel) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel P. Roeser $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-4632003 by on behalf of BAM Trading Services Inc.. (Roeser, Daniel) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, St. Clair County, case number 21-L-0962 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4632000), filed by BAM Trading Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Action Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roeser, Daniel) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAM Trading Services Inc. doing business as Binance.US is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ezekiel L Hill

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anna M. Thompson, PHV

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexander H. Southwell