This case was last updated from PACER on 11/08/2020 at 09:17:41 (UTC).

Kuhn v. State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 Kuhn filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael W. Mosman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01560

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Mosman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Constance Kuhn

Defendant and Counter Claimant

State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Donald L. Jacobs

514 West 9Th St.

Vancouver, WA 98660

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

David E. Smith

Attorney at Spooner & Much, P.C.

530 Center St Ne Ste 712

Salem, OR 97301

Ralph C. Spooner

Attorney at Spooner & Much,PC

530 Center Street, Suite 712

Salem, OR 97301

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 1/8/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/8/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 2/8/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (ecp) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company. (Spooner, Ralph) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

2 #4

Exhibit D - Honda Accord policy

2 #3

Exhibit C - Dodge Ram policy

2 #2

Exhibit B - VW Jetta policy

2 #1

Exhibit A - Subaru Forester policy

#2

(#2) Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) , Counterclaim for Declaratory Relief against Constance Kuhn. Filed by State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subaru Forester policy, #2 Exhibit B - VW Jetta policy, #3 Exhibit C - Dodge Ram policy, #4 Exhibit D - Honda Accord policy) (Spooner, Ralph) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - Proof of Service

1 #2

Exhibit B - Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 20cv27490 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7213750. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Proof of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet). (Spooner, Ralph) Modified docket text to add payment information on 9/9/2020 (eo). (Entered: 09/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 1/8/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/8/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 2/8/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (ecp) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company. (Spooner, Ralph) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) , Counterclaim for Declaratory Relief against Constance Kuhn. Filed by State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subaru Forester policy, #2 Exhibit B - VW Jetta policy, #3 Exhibit C - Dodge Ram policy, #4 Exhibit D - Honda Accord policy) (Spooner, Ralph) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 20cv27490 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7213750. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Proof of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet). (Spooner, Ralph) Modified docket text to add payment information on 9/9/2020 (eo). (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less