This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/01/2020 at 08:21:29 (UTC).

Bernhard Kuhmstedt v. Netease, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2020 Bernhard Kuhmstedt filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Netease, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Patrick J. Walsh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02044

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Patrick J. Walsh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bernhard Kuhmstedt

Defendants

DOES 1 through 10

Netease, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen M Doniger

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Justin M Gomes

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Scott A Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew P Lewis

Attorney at White and Case LLP

555 South Flower Street Suite 2700

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2433

Timothy F Keegan

Attorney at White and Case LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas 49Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Stefan Mentzer

Attorney at White and Case LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas 49Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Jeremy T Elman

Attorney at White and Case LLP

3000 El Camino Real, Two Palo Alto Square Suite 900

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Daniel Ledesma

Attorney at White and Case LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

#26

#25

24 #4

Proposed Order

24 #3

Exhibit A to Liu Declaration

24 #2

Declaration of Yang Liu

24 #1

Memorandum of Law

#24

#23

#22

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Netease, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of Yang Liu, #3 Exhibit A to Liu Declaration, #4 Proposed Order) (Mentzer, Stefan) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-00861 AB(PJWx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick and Judge Virginia A. Phillips to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-02044 AB(PJWx). Signed by Judge Andre Birotte Jr (rn) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Netease, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:20-cv-00861-AB-PJW; 2:20-cv-00862-RGK-KS; 2:20-cv-00863-DMG-MAA (Mentzer, Stefan) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting #13 Non-Resident Attorney Stefan M Mentzer APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant NetEase, Inc., designating Matthew P Lewis as local counsel. (bm) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Daniel Ledesma APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant NetEase, Inc., designating Matthew P Lewis as local counsel. (bm) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Timothy F Keegan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant NetEase, Inc., designating Matthew P Lewis as local counsel. (bm) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew P Lewis counsel for Defendant Netease, Inc.. Adding Matthew Lewis as counsel of record for NetEase, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant NetEase, Inc.. (Attorney Matthew P Lewis added to party Netease, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lewis, Matthew) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Bernhard Kuhmstedt. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (ghap) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Netease, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Bernhard Kuhmstedt. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Bernhard Kuhmstedt, (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Bernhard Kuhmstedt. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25577102 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Bernhard Kuhmstedt. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Bernhard Kuhmstedt(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NETEASE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANIEL LEDESMA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stefan Mentzer