This case was last updated from PACER on 09/08/2019 at 07:41:32 (UTC).

Kuewa, et al. v. Association of Apartment Owners of Mililani Town Houses, et al.

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 Kuewa filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Association of Apartment Owners of Mililani Town Houses. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH J. MANSFIELD and HELEN GILLMOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00367

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hawaii District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

KENNETH J. MANSFIELD

Presiding Judge

HELEN GILLMOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alexander K. Kuewa

Donna A. Kuewa

Defendants

Arlette S. Harada

Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC

Association of Apartment Owners of Mililani Town Houses

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven K.S. Chung

Attorney at Imanaka Asato, LLLC

745 Fort St 17Th Floor, 521-9500, Fax: 541-9050

Honolulu, HI 96813

Michael L. Iosua

Attorney at Imanaka Asato, LLLC

745 Fort St 17Th Floor

Honolulu, HI 96813

Timothy E. Ho

Attorney at Imanaka Asato, LLLC

745 Fort St 17Th Floor

Honolulu, HI 96813

Defendant Attorney

Dan C. Oyasato

Attorney at Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC

888 Mililani St, 2Nd Floor, 523-0702, Fax: 538-1927

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Certificate of Service

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Association of Apartment Owners of Mililani Town Houses. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Oyasato, Dan) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexander K. Kuewa, Donna A. Kuewa. Association of Apartment Owners of Mililani Town Houses served on 7/19/2019 . (Ho, Timothy) Modified on 7/24/2019 (emt, ). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexander K. Kuewa, Donna A. Kuewa. Arlette S. Harada 7/19/2019 . (Ho, Timothy) Modified on 7/24/2019 (emt, ). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexander K. Kuewa, Donna A. Kuewa. Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC 7/19/2019 . (Ho, Timothy) Modified on 7/24/2019 (emt, ). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

9 #2

AO 399- Waiver of Summons

9 #1

AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit

#9

(#9) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

8 #2

issued summons Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC

7 #1

Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure

#5

(#5) Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet by Alexander K. Kuewa, Donna A. Kuewa. (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2229742.), filed by Alexander K. Kuewa, Donna A. Kuewa (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Association of Apartment Owners of Mililani Town Houses. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Oyasato, Dan) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexander K. Kuewa, Donna A. Kuewa. Association of Apartment Owners of Mililani Town Houses served on 7/19/2019 . (Ho, Timothy) Modified on 7/24/2019 (emt, ). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexander K. Kuewa, Donna A. Kuewa. Arlette S. Harada 7/19/2019 . (Ho, Timothy) Modified on 7/24/2019 (emt, ). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexander K. Kuewa, Donna A. Kuewa. Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC 7/19/2019 . (Ho, Timothy) Modified on 7/24/2019 (emt, ). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Association of Apartment Owners of Mililani Town Houses, Arlette S. Harada, Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC, (Attachments: #1 issued summons Arlette S. Harada, #2 issued summons Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC)(cib) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:30AM on 9/9/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • (#6) NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00367-HG-KJM on all further pleadings. (cib) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet by Alexander K. Kuewa, Donna A. Kuewa. (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2229742.), filed by Alexander K. Kuewa, Donna A. Kuewa (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.