This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/08/2019 at 07:57:33 (UTC).

KUENZI v. ZERO MOTORCYCLES, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 KUENZI filed an Other lawsuit against ZERO MOTORCYCLES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN R. PADOVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00078

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN R. PADOVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSIAH M. KUENZI

Defendant

ZERO MOTORCYCLES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROBERT RAPKIN

Attorney at KIMMEL & SILVERMAN PC

30 E. Butler Pike

Ambler, PA 19002

JASON GRESHES

Attorney at KIMMEL & SILVERMAN

30 East Butler Pike

Ambler, PA 19002

Defendant Attorneys

JOHN B. CONSEVAGE

Attorney at DILWORTH PAXSON LLP

2 N. 2Nd St Suite 1101

Harrisburg, PA 17101

RENARDO L. HICKS

Attorney at DILWORTH PAXSON, LP

2 North Second Street, Suite 1101

Harrisburg, PA 17101

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 6/20/2019 09:30 AM IN Philadelphia.(ahf) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by ZERO MOTORCYCLES, INC..(HICKS, RENARDO) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by ZERO MOTORCYCLES, INC.. (CONSEVAGE, JOHN) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. #4 ) IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 1/28/2019.1/29/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against ZERO MOTORCYCLES, INC., filed by JOSIAH M. KUENZI.(amas) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by JOSIAH M. KUENZI.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service.(GRESHES, JASON) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

4 #2

Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#4) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ZERO MOTORCYCLES, INC..Brief and certificate of service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(CONSEVAGE, JOHN) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JASON GRESHES on behalf of JOSIAH M. KUENZI (GRESHES, JASON) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ZERO MOTORCYCLES, INC..(ahf) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheets

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ZERO MOTORCYCLES, INC. from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County, case number 181102292. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 190480) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2019
  • (#11) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (sg, ) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 6/20/2019 09:30 AM IN Philadelphia.(ahf) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by ZERO MOTORCYCLES, INC..(HICKS, RENARDO) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by ZERO MOTORCYCLES, INC.. (CONSEVAGE, JOHN) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. #4 ) IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 1/28/2019.1/29/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against ZERO MOTORCYCLES, INC., filed by JOSIAH M. KUENZI.(amas) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by JOSIAH M. KUENZI.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service.(GRESHES, JASON) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ZERO MOTORCYCLES, INC..Brief and certificate of service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(CONSEVAGE, JOHN) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JASON GRESHES on behalf of JOSIAH M. KUENZI (GRESHES, JASON) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Case Eligible for Arbitration(ahf) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ZERO MOTORCYCLES, INC..(ahf) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ZERO MOTORCYCLES, INC. from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County, case number 181102292. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 190480) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zero Motorcycles, Inc. is a litigant