This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2020 at 14:14:56 (UTC).

Larry J. Kudsk v. Federal Solutions Group, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 Larry J Kudsk filed a Contract - Miller Act lawsuit against Federal Solutions Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen V. Wilson and Rozella A. Oliver. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00389

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Miller Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Larry J Kudsk

Larry J. Kudsk

Larry J. Kudsk doing business as Kudsk Construction Services

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Federal Solutions Group, Inc.

Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland

The Vertex Companies

Does 1-10

Federal Solutions Group

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Larry J. Kudsk

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William J Braun

Attorney at Braun and Melucci LLP

7855 Ivanhoe Avenue Suite 400

La Jolla, CA 92037

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

David C Veis

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3208

Laura P Nash

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3211

 

Court Documents

#16

15 #4

Exhibit 4

15 #3

Exhibit 3

15 #2

Exhibit 2

15 #1

Exhibit 1

#15

#14

13 #2

Exhibit Exhibits C-D

13 #1

Exhibit Exhibits A-B

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#6

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit C-D

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibits A-B

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant and Counter-Plaintiff Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, (Veis, David) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #13 AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Larry J. Kudsk filed by Defendant and Counter-Plaintiff Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Attorney David C Veis added to party Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland(pty:dft))(Veis, David) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Larry J. Kudsk, upon Defendant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Braun, William) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Use-Plaintiff Larry J. Kudsk (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-B, #2 Exhibit Exhibits C-D)(Braun, William) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Larry J. Kudsk, upon Defendant Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019; The Vertex Companies served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Vertex Companies in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Braun, William) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Use-Plaintiff CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Braun, William) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Federal Solutions Group, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, The Vertex Companies. (lh) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Summons was issued with the incorrect date. Please disregard docket No. 6. Re: Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #6 (lh) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Federal Solutions Group, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, The Vertex Companies. (lh) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Larry J Kudsk. (Braun, William) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Larry J Kudsk. (Braun, William) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23061999 - Fee: $400. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-B, #2 Exhibit Exhibit C-D) (Attorney William J Braun added to party Larry J Kudsk(pty:pla))(Braun, William) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE VERTEX COMPANIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND is a litigant

Latest cases where FEDERAL SOLUTIONS GROUP, INC. is a litigant