This case was last updated from PACER on 11/24/2020 at 08:50:12 (UTC).

Kubenik v. Prudential Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Kubenik filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Prudential Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are John L. Badalamenti and Mac R. McCoy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00737

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John L. Badalamenti

Referral Judge

Mac R. McCoy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anna Kubenik

Defendant

Prudential Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven E. Hovsepian

Attorney at Barbas, Nunez, Sanders, Butler & Hovsepian

1802 W Cleveland St

Tampa, FL 33606-1852

Defendant Attorney

William Cleveland Acree, II

Attorney at Quintairos, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, PA

255 S Orange Ave Ste 900

Orlando, FL 32801-3454

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Acree, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Track 1 notice and Related Cases Order by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Acree, William) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Track 1 notice and Related Cases Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Prudential Insurance Company of America. Related case(s): no (Acree, William) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Acree, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Track 1 notice and Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Anna Kubenik. Related case(s): no (Hovsepian, Steven) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#4

(#4) TRACK ONE AND RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/1/2020. (jmc) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Prudential Insurance Company of America. (MLS) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Prudential Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17352761) filed by Anna Kubenik. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, # #4 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hovsepian, Steven) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Defendant the Prudential Insurance Company of America's Second Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant must respond to the Complaint (Doc. #1) no later than 12/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 11/23/2020. (WJF) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Acree, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant must respond to the Complaint (Doc. #1) no later than 11/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 10/14/2020. (McCoy, Mac) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Track 1 notice and Related Cases Order by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Acree, William) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Track 1 notice and Related Cases Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Prudential Insurance Company of America. Related case(s): no (Acree, William) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Acree, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Track 1 notice and Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Anna Kubenik. Related case(s): no (Hovsepian, Steven) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) TRACK ONE AND RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/1/2020. (jmc) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Prudential Insurance Company of America. (MLS) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-737-FtM-66MRM. (SJB) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Prudential Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17352761) filed by Anna Kubenik. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, # #4 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hovsepian, Steven) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Prudential Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven E. Hovsepian