This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 09:05:21 (UTC).

KT Imaging USA, LLC v. LG ELECTRONICS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2020 KT Imaging USA, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against LG ELECTRONICS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00338

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KT Imaging USA, LLC

Defendants

LG ELECTRONICS, INC.

LG Electronic U.S.A, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis

Attorney at The Stafford Davis Firm, PC - Tyler

815 S Broadway Ave

Tyler, TX 75701

Brandon Gregory Moore

Attorney at Kheyfits Belenky LLP - Austin

108 Wild Basin Road South, Suite 250

Austin, TX 78746

Dmitry Kheyfits

Attorney at Kheyfits Belenky LLP

4 Embarcadero Center, Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94111

Hanna Glomska Cohen

Attorney at Kheyfits Belenky LLP

1140 Avenue Of The Americas, 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Catherine Susan Bartles

Attorney at The Stafford Davis Firm, PC - Tyler

815 S Broadway Ave

Tyler, TX 75701

Andrey Belenky

Attorney at Kheyfits Belenky LLP

1140 Avenue Of The Americas, 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/19/2020. (rpc, ) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, by KT Imaging USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Belenky, Andrey) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

1 #42

Attachment A

1 #41

Exhibit 41

1 #40

Exhibit 40

1 #37

Exhibit 37

1 #36

Exhibit 36

1 #35

Exhibit 35

1 #34

Exhibit 34

1 #33

Exhibit 33

1 #31

Exhibit 31

1 #30

Exhibit 30

1 #18

Exhibit 18

1 #15

Exhibit 15

1 #14

Exhibit 14

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #3

Exhibit 3

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketAnswer Due Deadline Updated for LG Electronic U.S.A, Inc. to 8/17/2020. (rpc, ) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/19/2020. (rpc, ) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, by KT Imaging USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Belenky, Andrey) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KT Imaging USA, LLC. LG ELECTRONICS, INC. waiver sent on 5/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Belenky, Andrey) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by KT Imaging USA, LLC. LG Electronic U.S.A, Inc. served on 4/30/2020, answer due 5/21/2020. (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS REISSUED as to LG Electronic U.S.A, Inc. (rpc, ) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Susan Bartles on behalf of KT Imaging USA, LLC (Bartles, Catherine) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to LG Electronic U.S.A, Inc. (rpc, ) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to LG ELECTRONICS, INC. (rpc, ) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, ) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, ) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by KT Imaging USA, LLC (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement (Original) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7758709.), filed by KT Imaging USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Attachment A, #43 Attachment B, #44 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KT Imaging USA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LG ELECTRONIC USA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandon Gregory Moore