This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/21/2022 at 09:00:19 (UTC).

KT Imaging USA, LLC v. Hanwha Techwin Co., LTD

Case Summary

On 08/22/2022 KT Imaging USA, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Hanwha Techwin Co , LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00874

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KT Imaging USA, LLC

Defendant

Hanwha Techwin Co., LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Raymond W Mort, III

Attorney at The Mort Law Firm, PLLC

501 Congress Ave, Suite 150

Austin, TX 78701

Andrey Belenky

Attorney at Kheyfits Belenky LLP

80 Broad St., 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Brandon Moore

Attorney at Kheyfits Belenky LLP

12600 Hill Country Blvd., Suite R-275

Austin, TX 78738

Dmitry Kheyfits

Attorney at Kheyfits Belenky LLP

12600 Hill Country Blvd., Suite R-275

Austin, TX 78738

Hanna G. Cohen

Attorney at Kheyfits Belenky LLP

1140 Avenue Of The Americas, 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Change of Address by Brandon Moore (Moore, Brandon) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Change of Address by Dmitry Kheyfits (Kheyfits, Dmitry) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Hanwha Techwin Co., LTD. (lad) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by KT Imaging USA, LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by KT Imaging USA, LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Related Cases by KT Imaging USA, LLC re #1 Complaint, (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #9

Exhibit

1 #8

Exhibit

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #1

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Change of Address by Brandon Moore (Moore, Brandon) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Change of Address by Dmitry Kheyfits (Kheyfits, Dmitry) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketParties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #standing orders available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows:1. #Standing Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases,2. #Amended Standing Order On Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases. (bot4) (Entered: 09/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/.(lad) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Hanwha Techwin Co., LTD. (lad) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by KT Imaging USA, LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by KT Imaging USA, LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Related Cases by KT Imaging USA, LLC re #1 Complaint, (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16433909), filed by KT Imaging USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HANWHA TECHWIN AMERICA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KT Imaging USA, LLC is a litigant