This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2019 at 10:00:42 (UTC).

K.S.L.N. et al v. Doe Run Resources Corporation, The et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 K S L N filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Doe Run Resources Corporation, The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Ross and Rodney W. Sippel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00846

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

John A. Ross

Rodney W. Sippel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chris Collins

K. S.L. N.

Defendants

Renco Holdings, Inc.

Jerry Pyatt

Ira L. Rennert

Doe Run Resources Corporation, The

Marvin K. Kaiser

D.R. Acquisition Corp.

Theodore P. Fox, III

Jeffrey L. Zelms

Renco Group, Inc., The

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew V. Tramont

Attorney at RODRIGUEZ AND TRAMONT

255 Alhambra Circle, Suite 1150

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Hunter J. Shkolnik

Attorney at NAPOLI SHKOLNIK PLLC

360 Lexington Avenue, 11Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

D. Todd Mathews

Attorney at GORI AND JULIAN, P.C.

156 N. Main St.

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Defendant Attorneys

Edward L. Dowd, Jr.

Attorney at DOWD BENNETT, LLP

7733 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 1900

Clayton, MO 63105

Jeffrey R. Hoops

Attorney at DOWD BENNETT, LLP

7733 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 1900

Clayton, MO 63105

Terrence J. O'Toole

406 Gascony Way

St. Louis, MO 63122

Thomas P. Berra, Jr.

Attorney at LEWIS RICE, LLC

600 Washington, Suite 2500

St. Louis, MO 63101

Michael J. Hickey

Attorney at LEWIS RICE, LLC

600 Washington, Suite 2500

St. Louis, MO 63101

Andrew Rothschild

Attorney at LEWIS RICE, LLC

600 Washington, Suite 2500

St. Louis, MO 63101

Patrick J. Thornton

Attorney at LEWIS RICE, LLC

600 Washington, Suite 2500

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER [COPY OF ORDER AS ENTERED IN 4:15-CV-01704 RWS ON 3/5/2019]: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the claims of Plaintiffs in the following cases shall be severed. The Clerk of Court shall open and randomly assign a new case for each Plaintiff (or two related Plaintiffs) using the complaint filed in each case: L.D.A.S. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 1924 RWS; C.M.A.M. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 1927 RWS; G.P.A.E. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 1933 RWS; A.B.A.M. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 1934 RWS; E.J.H.C. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 1935 RWS; M.B.H.A. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 1936 RWS; L.C.A.B. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 1940 RWS; L.G.A.G. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 1948 RWS; A.V.A.S. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 1957 RWS; A.L.A.C. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 1959 RWS; R.Y.A.P. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 1963 RWS; D.J.A.R. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 2001 RWS; R.C.S.L. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 2207 RWS; K.F.P.R. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 2858 RWS; A.C.Y.A. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:18 CV 560 RWS; A.S.A.T. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:18 CV 638 RWS; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that after these cases are severed, each of the severed cases shall be consolidated with this Lead Case before me for all pretrial proceedings. Once the cases are ready for trial, they will be returned to the docket of the judge in this district to whom they were assigned before consolidation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future filings shall be made only in this Lead Case and should only reference the case number of this Lead Case in the caption of the filing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file a copy of this order in each of the cases listed above and in the new severed cases. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/5/19. (JWD) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER [COPY OF ORDER AS ENTERED IN 4:15-CV-01704 RWS ON 2/27/2019]:IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants The Renco Group, Renco Holdings, Inc., and Ira Rennert's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction 174 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall docket this order in all the cases listed in footnotes 2 and 3 of this order. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 2/27/19. (JWD) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER [COPY OF ORDER AS ENTERED IN 4:15-CV-01704 RWS ON 2/11/2019]: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion to dismiss pursuant to the doctrine of international comity 135 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' motion for determination of foreign law 253 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall docket this order in any case which is pending consolidation with the present case. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 2/11/19. (JWD) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Doe Run Resources Corporation, The, Theodore P. Fox, III, Marvin K. Kaiser, Jerry Pyatt, Jeffrey L. Zelms.(JWD) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by D.R. Acquisition Corp.(JWD) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#2

(#2) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, filed by Plaintiffs.(JWD) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

1 #11

Supplement State Court File Part 5 of 6

1 #10

Supplement State Court File Part 4 of 6

1 #9

Supplement State Court File Part 3 of 6

1 #8

Supplement State Court File Part 2 of 6

1 #7

Supplement State Court File Part 1 of 6

1 #6

Original Filing Form

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 2 of 2

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 1 of 2

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, case number 1722-CC01713, Jury Demand, filed by Renco Group, Inc., The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 2 of 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form, #7 Supplement State Court File Part 1 of 6, #8 Supplement State Court File Part 2 of 6, #9 Supplement State Court File Part 3 of 6, #10 Supplement State Court File Part 4 of 6, #11 Supplement State Court File Part 5 of 6, #12 Supplement State Court File Part 6 of 6)(JWD) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (JWD) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER [COPY OF ORDER AS ENTERED IN 4:15-CV-01704 RWS ON 3/5/2019]: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the claims of Plaintiffs in the following cases shall be severed. The Clerk of Court shall open and randomly assign a new case for each Plaintiff (or two related Plaintiffs) using the complaint filed in each case: L.D.A.S. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 1924 RWS; C.M.A.M. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 1927 RWS; G.P.A.E. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 1933 RWS; A.B.A.M. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 1934 RWS; E.J.H.C. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 1935 RWS; M.B.H.A. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 1936 RWS; L.C.A.B. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 1940 RWS; L.G.A.G. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 1948 RWS; A.V.A.S. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 1957 RWS; A.L.A.C. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 1959 RWS; R.Y.A.P. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 1963 RWS; D.J.A.R. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 2001 RWS; R.C.S.L. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 2207 RWS; K.F.P.R. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:17 CV 2858 RWS; A.C.Y.A. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:18 CV 560 RWS; A.S.A.T. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al., 4:18 CV 638 RWS; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that after these cases are severed, each of the severed cases shall be consolidated with this Lead Case before me for all pretrial proceedings. Once the cases are ready for trial, they will be returned to the docket of the judge in this district to whom they were assigned before consolidation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future filings shall be made only in this Lead Case and should only reference the case number of this Lead Case in the caption of the filing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file a copy of this order in each of the cases listed above and in the new severed cases. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/5/19. (JWD) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER [COPY OF ORDER AS ENTERED IN 4:15-CV-01704 RWS ON 2/27/2019]:IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants The Renco Group, Renco Holdings, Inc., and Ira Rennert's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction 174 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall docket this order in all the cases listed in footnotes 2 and 3 of this order. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 2/27/19. (JWD) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER [COPY OF ORDER AS ENTERED IN 4:15-CV-01704 RWS ON 2/11/2019]: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion to dismiss pursuant to the doctrine of international comity 135 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' motion for determination of foreign law 253 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall docket this order in any case which is pending consolidation with the present case. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 2/11/19. (JWD) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Doe Run Resources Corporation, The, Theodore P. Fox, III, Marvin K. Kaiser, Jerry Pyatt, Jeffrey L. Zelms.(JWD) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint by D.R. Acquisition Corp.(JWD) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, filed by Plaintiffs.(JWD) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, case number 1722-CC01713, Jury Demand, filed by Renco Group, Inc., The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 2 of 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form, #7 Supplement State Court File Part 1 of 6, #8 Supplement State Court File Part 2 of 6, #9 Supplement State Court File Part 3 of 6, #10 Supplement State Court File Part 4 of 6, #11 Supplement State Court File Part 5 of 6, #12 Supplement State Court File Part 6 of 6)(JWD) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Renco Holdings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Renco Group, Inc., The is a litigant