This case was last updated from PACER on 03/24/2019 at 07:32:23 (UTC).

KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc. v. US Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service

Case Summary

On 01/23/2019 KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against US Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph N. Laplante. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00082

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph N. Laplante

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc.

Defendants

Internal Revenue Service

United States Department of Revenue

US Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter D. Anderson

Attorney at McLane Middleton

900 Elm St, Po Box 326

Manchester, NH 03105-0326

Jaqueline Anne Botchman

Attorney at McLane Middleton

900 Elm St, Po Box 326

Manchester, NH 03105-0326

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, Without Prejudice by KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc.(Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#9

(#9) STATUS REPORT by KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc. : Joint Status Report(Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER re #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Temp Restraining Order. IRS shall respond to the Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order by January 30, 2019. Defendants shall promptly notify the court if any levy against KSD is to issue. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Jacqueline A. Botchman must complete an online registration form within 30 days. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Compliance Deadline set for 2/22/2019.(cmp) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#6

(#6) Assented to MOTION Seal Exhibits to Complaint filed by KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc..(Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

5 #6

*Restricted*

5 #5

*Restricted*

5 #4

Proposed Order Proposed Order

5 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Form 433B

5 #2

*Restricted*

5 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temp Restraining Order filed by KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc.. HEARING REQUESTED. Follow up on Objection on 2/7/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). Certain exhibit(s) maintained conventionally in Clerks Office. (Attorney filers must submit conventional materials to the court within 72 hours.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in support of motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Notices, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Form 433B, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Anderson, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2019: #5 REDACTED VERSION of Exhibit 1 -, #6 REDACTED VERSION of Exhibit 2) (cmp). (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement by KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter D. Anderson on behalf of KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc. Attorney Botchman (Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

2 #1

Notice ECF

#2

(#2) Summons issued electronically as to US Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

1 #2

*Restricted*

1 #1

Affidavit of Beth Fowler

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENDORSED ORDER reviewing #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Civil Case Terminated. (cmp) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, Without Prejudice by KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc.(Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STATUS REPORT by KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc. : Joint Status Report(Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion to Seal Exhibits to Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 1/25/2019. (Pltfs Atty: Jaqueline Botchman, Esq.) (Defts Atty: David Pourde, Esq.), Court Reporter: Liza Dubois) (Total Hearing Time: 25 minutes) (cmp) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER re #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Temp Restraining Order. IRS shall respond to the Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order by January 30, 2019. Defendants shall promptly notify the court if any levy against KSD is to issue. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Jacqueline A. Botchman must complete an online registration form within 30 days. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Compliance Deadline set for 2/22/2019.(cmp) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Hearing re: #5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temp Restraining Order. Telephone Conference set for 1/25/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The court will initiate the call.(cmp) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Assented to MOTION Seal Exhibits to Complaint filed by KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc..(Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temp Restraining Order filed by KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc.. HEARING REQUESTED. Follow up on Objection on 2/7/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). Certain exhibit(s) maintained conventionally in Clerks Office. (Attorney filers must submit conventional materials to the court within 72 hours.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in support of motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Notices, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Form 433B, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Anderson, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2019: #5 REDACTED VERSION of Exhibit 1 -, #6 REDACTED VERSION of Exhibit 2) (cmp). (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement by KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter D. Anderson on behalf of KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc. Attorney Botchman (Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons issued electronically as to US Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE re: #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by January 30, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 1/30/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (mc) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-82-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1761677 filed by KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc..(Anderson, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2019: #1 Affidavit of Beth Fowler, #2 Exhibit 1 Notices of Intent to Levy, #3 Exhibit 2 Form 433-B, #4 Redacted Exhibit 2, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons) (mc). (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.