This case was last updated from PACER on 01/07/2020 at 07:10:48 (UTC).

Krzyzanowski v Brunch Ltd et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 Krzyzanowski filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Brunch Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrea R. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07427

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrea R. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amanda Krzyzanowski

Defendants

Ted Zatos

Brunch Ltd

BNL St. Charles Corporation

Andrew Zatos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan F Stephan

Attorney at Stephan, Zouras, LLP

100 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 2150

Chicago, IL 60606

Megan Shannon

Attorney at Stephan Zouras, Llp

100 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 2150

Chicago, IL 60606

James B. Zouras

Attorney at Stephan Zouras, LLP

100 North Riverside Plaza, Suite 2150

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Konstantinos T. Sparagis

Attorney at Law Offices of Konstantine Sparagis, P.C.

900 W Jackson, Suite 4E

Chicago, IL 60607

Brian Dean Ekstrom

Attorney at Pappas O'Connor, P.C.

900 West Jackson Boulevard, Six West

Chicago, IL 60607

John C. O'Connor

Attorney at Pappas O'Connor, P.C.

900 West Jackson Boulevard, Six West

Chicago, IL 60607

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amanda Krzyzanowski by Megan Shannon (Shannon, Megan) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#16

(#16) FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by BNL St. Charles Corporation (Ekstrom, Brian) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Stephan, Ryan) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

13 #2

LR 3.2 Notification as to Affiliates

#19

(#19) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: The Court's protective order entered on December 17, 2019 #18 was entered in error and is hereby vacated. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#18

(#18) QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 12/17/2019. Mailed notice(ef, ) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amanda Krzyzanowski by Ryan F Stephan (Stephan, Ryan) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

#1

(#13) MOTION by Defendants BNL St. Charles Corporation, Brunch Ltd, Andrew Zatos, Ted Zatos for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 or otherwise plead joint unopposed (Attachments: #1 LR 3.2 Notification as to Affiliates, #2 LR 3.2 Notification as to Affiliates)(Ekstrom, Brian) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Motion by Brian Dean Ekstrom for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #13 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 12/18/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Ekstrom, Brian) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amanda Krzyzanowski by James B. Zouras (Zouras, James) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#17

(#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendants' Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer #13 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead by 1/9/2020. The motion presentment date of 12/18/2019 is stricken; parties need not appear. Initial status hearing set for 1/9/2020 is stricken and reset for 1/30/2020 at 9:00 AM. At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#13

(#13) MOTION by Defendants BNL St. Charles Corporation, Brunch Ltd, Andrew Zatos, Ted Zatos for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 or otherwise plead joint unopposed (Attachments: #1 LR 3.2 Notification as to Affiliates, #2 LR 3.2 Notification as to Affiliates)(Ekstrom, Brian) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 1/9/2020 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#15

(#15) FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Brunch Ltd (Ekstrom, Brian) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda Krzyzanowski as to Andrew Zatos on 11/23/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Ted Zatos on 11/23/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Stephan, Ryan) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

13 #1

LR 3.2 Notification as to Affiliates

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: The Court's protective order entered on December 17, 2019 #18 was entered in error and is hereby vacated. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 12/17/2019. Mailed notice(ef, ) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendants' Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer #13 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead by 1/9/2020. The motion presentment date of 12/18/2019 is stricken; parties need not appear. Initial status hearing set for 1/9/2020 is stricken and reset for 1/30/2020 at 9:00 AM. At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by BNL St. Charles Corporation (Ekstrom, Brian) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Brunch Ltd (Ekstrom, Brian) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Motion by Brian Dean Ekstrom for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #13 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 12/18/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Ekstrom, Brian) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION by Defendants BNL St. Charles Corporation, Brunch Ltd, Andrew Zatos, Ted Zatos for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 or otherwise plead joint unopposed (Attachments: #1 LR 3.2 Notification as to Affiliates, #2 LR 3.2 Notification as to Affiliates)(Ekstrom, Brian) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BNL St. Charles Corporation, Brunch Ltd by Brian Dean Ekstrom (Ekstrom, Brian) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BNL St. Charles Corporation, Brunch Ltd by John C. O'Connor (O'Connor, John) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda Krzyzanowski as to BNL St. Charles Corporation on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; Brunch Ltd on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Stephan, Ryan) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amanda Krzyzanowski by James B. Zouras (Zouras, James) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda Krzyzanowski as to Andrew Zatos on 11/23/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Ted Zatos on 11/23/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Stephan, Ryan) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 1/9/2020 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amanda Krzyzanowski by Megan Shannon (Shannon, Megan) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants BNL St. Charles Corporation, Brunch Ltd, Andrew Zatos, Ted Zatos (Lam, Tina) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Lam, Tina) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amanda Krzyzanowski by Ryan F Stephan (Stephan, Ryan) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Stephan, Ryan) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Amanda Krzyzanowski; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16425267. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stephan, Ryan) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.