This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:01:25 (UTC).

Krypt, Inc. v. RoPaar LLC

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Krypt, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against RoPaar LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Virginia K. DeMarchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-03226

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia K. DeMarchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

a California corpora Krypt, Inc.

177 Post Street, Ste 700

San Francisco, CA 94108

Krypt, Inc.

Defendants

ROPAAR LLC

Clay Robinson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Harmeet K. Dhillon

Attorney at Dhillon Law Group Inc.

177 Post Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94108

Michael Ryan Fleming

Attorney at Dhillon Law Group Inc.

177 Post Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94108

Krista L Baughman

Attorney at Dhillon Law Group Inc.

177 Post Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94108

Defendant Attorneys

Mandi Akens Phillips

Attorney at Klemchuk LLP

8150 N. Central Expressway, 10Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75206

Darin Michael Klemchuk

Attorney at Klemchuk LLP

8150 North Central Expressway, 10Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75206

Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld

Attorney at Kronenberger Rosenfeld, LLP

150 Post Street, Suite 520

San Francisco, CA 94108

Brian Casper

Attorney at Klemchuk LLP

8150 N. Central Expressway, 10Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75206

Karl Stephen Kronenberger

Attorney at Kronenberger Rosenfeld, LLP

150 Post Street, Suite 520

San Francisco, CA 94108

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#14

(#14) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #11 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice as to Mandi Phillips. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#11

(#11) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Mandi Phillips ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13513800.) filed by RoPaar LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 7/12/2019) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #10 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice as to Darin M. Klemchuk. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

10 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#10

(#10) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Darin M. Klemchuk ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13513782.) filed by RoPaar LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 7/12/2019) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

9 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#9

(#9) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Brian Casper ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13513726.) filed by RoPaar LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 7/12/2019) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #9 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice as to Brian Casper. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Krypt, Inc.. RoPaar LLC served on 6/30/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 7/8/2019) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant Ropaar LLC to Respond to Complaint filed by RoPaar LLC. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/8/2019) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Krypt, Inc... (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 6/20/2019) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to RoPaar LLC, Clay Robinson. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 6/10/2019) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13420033.). Filed byKrypt, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 6/7/2019) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #11 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice as to Mandi Phillips. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #10 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice as to Darin M. Klemchuk. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #9 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice as to Brian Casper. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Mandi Phillips ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13513800.) filed by RoPaar LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 7/12/2019) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Darin M. Klemchuk ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13513782.) filed by RoPaar LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 7/12/2019) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Brian Casper ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13513726.) filed by RoPaar LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 7/12/2019) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Krypt, Inc.. RoPaar LLC served on 6/30/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 7/8/2019) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant Ropaar LLC to Respond to Complaint filed by RoPaar LLC. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/8/2019) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Krypt, Inc... (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 6/20/2019) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to RoPaar LLC, Clay Robinson. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 6/10/2019) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • (#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/24/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13420033.). Filed byKrypt, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 6/7/2019) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.