This case was last updated from PACER on 02/25/2020 at 07:30:59 (UTC).

Kruzel v Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/27/2019 Kruzel filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patrick J. Schiltz and Leo I. Brisbois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-03182

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patrick J. Schiltz

Referral Judge

Leo I. Brisbois

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amy Kruzel

Defendants

Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.

Cooper Companies, Inc., The

Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.

Teva Women's Health, Inc.

Coopersurgical, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Yvonne M Flaherty

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP

100 Washington Ave S Ste 2200

Mpls, MN 55401-2179

Tobias L Millrood

Attorney at Pogust Millrood, LLC

Eight Tower Bridge, 161 Washington Street, Suite 940

Conshohocken, PA 19428

Kara D. Hill

Attorney at Pogust Millrood, LLC

161 Washington Street, Suite 940

Conshohocken, PA 19428

Defendant Attorneys

Mary Lynn Tate

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne LLP

600 Vine St., Ste 2800

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Frederick M. Erny

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne, LLP

600 Vine St., Suite 2800

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Tracy J Van Steenburgh

Attorney at Nilan Johnson Lewis PA

250 Marquette Avenue South, Suite 800

Minneapolis, MN 55401

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES, LTD. for TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.; Corporate Parent TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. for TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.; Corporate Parent THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. for COOPERSURGICAL, INC.; Corporate Parent TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. for TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC.. by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

40 #1

*Restricted*

#44

(#44) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kara D. Hill. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7385935 filed by Amy Kruzel. (Flaherty, Yvonne) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Amendment to Notice of Removal to Attach Additional State Court Process, Pleadings and Orders (STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#48

(#48) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mary Lynn Tate. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7478694 filed by Cooper Companies, Inc., The, Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Van Steenburgh, Tracy) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#40

(#40) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-03986. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois per Sixth Division Master List. (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#47

(#47) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Frederick M. Erny. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7478679 filed by Cooper Companies, Inc., The, Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Van Steenburgh, Tracy) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#1

(#8) NOTICE by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Amendment to Notice of Removal to Attach Additional State Court Process, Pleadings and Orders (STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by COOPERSURGICAL, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#43

(#43) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tobias L. Millrood. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7385921 filed by Amy Kruzel. (Flaherty, Yvonne) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 9/18/18. 9/18/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.] (Entered: 09/18/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheets

#42

(#42) NOTICE of Appearance by Yvonne M Flaherty on behalf of Amy Kruzel. (Flaherty, Yvonne) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#46

(#46) NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy J Van Steenburgh on behalf of Cooper Companies, Inc., The, Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Van Steenburgh, Tracy) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #47 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Frederick M. Erny for Cooper Companies, Inc., The, Coopersurgical, Inc., and for Teva Women's Health, Inc.; granting #48 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mary Lynn Tate for Cooper Companies, Inc., The, Coopersurgical, Inc., and for Teva Women's Health, Inc. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 2/18/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mary Lynn Tate. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7478694 filed by Cooper Companies, Inc., The, Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Van Steenburgh, Tracy) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Frederick M. Erny. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7478679 filed by Cooper Companies, Inc., The, Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Van Steenburgh, Tracy) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy J Van Steenburgh on behalf of Cooper Companies, Inc., The, Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (Van Steenburgh, Tracy) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #43 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tobias L Millrood for Amy Kruzel; granting #44 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kara D. Hill for Amy Kruzel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/10/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kara D. Hill. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7385935 filed by Amy Kruzel. (Flaherty, Yvonne) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tobias L. Millrood. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7385921 filed by Amy Kruzel. (Flaherty, Yvonne) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE of Appearance by Yvonne M Flaherty on behalf of Amy Kruzel. (Flaherty, Yvonne) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • Docket(#41) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Tobias Millrood, Kara D. Hill, Brian Rubenstein, Gregory T. Sturges, Frederick M. Erny as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt) cc: Tobias Millrood, Kara D. Hill, Brian Rubenstein, Gregory T. Sturges, Frederick M. Erny. (kt) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-03986. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois per Sixth Division Master List. (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/16/2018 09:30 AM IN JUDGE BARTLE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III. ADDITIONAL CONFERENCE INFORMATION CONTAINED HEREIN.(km, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.] (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 9/18/18. 9/18/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.] (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Amendment to Notice of Removal to Attach Additional State Court Process, Pleadings and Orders (STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by COOPERSURGICAL, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES, LTD. for TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.; Corporate Parent TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. for TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.; Corporate Parent THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. for COOPERSURGICAL, INC.; Corporate Parent TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. for TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC.. by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County, case number 180401533. Certicicate of Service.(Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 184812) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.