This case was last updated from PACER on 05/05/2020 at 16:02:29 (UTC).

KRUMWIED v. COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK INC.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 KRUMWIED filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Debra McVicker Lynch. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04800

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Debra McVicker Lynch

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NANCY KRUMWIED

Defendant

COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Darron S. Stewart

Attorney at STEWART & STEWART

931 South Rangeline Road

Carmel, IN 46032

Cherry Malichi

Attorney at STEWART & STEWART

931 S. Rangeline Road

Carmel, IN 46032

Tiffany Ruth Guthrie

Attorney at STEWART & STEWART

931 S. Rangeline Road

Carmel, IN 46032

Nicholas J. Wagner

Attorney at STEWART & STEWART

931 S.Rangeline Road

Carmel, IN 46032

Defendant Attorneys

Brandon M. Shelton

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Tiaundra Marie Foster

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) Witness List PRELIMINARY, filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK INC., Exhibit List PRELIMINARY, filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK INC.. (Foster, Tiaundra) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#29

(#29) STATUS REPORT JOINT by COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK INC.. (Foster, Tiaundra) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

#28

(#28) Witness List Preliminary, filed by Plaintiff NANCY KRUMWIED. (Guthrie, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#27

(#27) Exhibit List Preliminary, filed by Plaintiff NANCY KRUMWIED. (Guthrie, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Wagner on behalf of Plaintiff NANCY KRUMWIED. (Wagner, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#25

(#25) ORDER granting Defendant's #21 Motion to Withdraw. It is ordered that docket entries Nos. 20 and 20-1 shall be withdrawn from the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 3/19/2020. (SWM) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#24

(#24) UNIFORM STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER #22 SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 3/19/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

22 #1

Exhibit 1 - Uniform Stipulated Protective Order

#21

(#21) MOTION to Withdraw #20 MOTION for Protective Order JOINT (Docket Entries Nos. 20 and 20-1), filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK INC.. (Foster, Tiaundra) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon M. Shelton on behalf of Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK INC.. (Shelton, Brandon) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK INC. (JRB) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Darron S. Stewart on behalf of Plaintiff NANCY KRUMWIED. (Stewart, Darron) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Cherry Malichi on behalf of Plaintiff NANCY KRUMWIED. (Malichi, Cherry) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A Notice of Rights Letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK INC., filed by NANCY KRUMWIED. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5753241) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Rights Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Malichi, Cherry) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Witness List PRELIMINARY, filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK INC., Exhibit List PRELIMINARY, filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK INC.. (Foster, Tiaundra) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) STATUS REPORT JOINT by COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK INC.. (Foster, Tiaundra) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Witness List Preliminary, filed by Plaintiff NANCY KRUMWIED. (Guthrie, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Exhibit List Preliminary, filed by Plaintiff NANCY KRUMWIED. (Guthrie, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Wagner on behalf of Plaintiff NANCY KRUMWIED. (Wagner, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER granting Defendant's #21 Motion to Withdraw. It is ordered that docket entries Nos. 20 and 20-1 shall be withdrawn from the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 3/19/2020. (SWM) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) UNIFORM STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER #22 SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 3/19/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Submission of Proposed Order , re #21 MOTION to Withdraw #20 MOTION for Protective Order JOINT (Docket Entries Nos. 20 and 20-1), filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK INC.. (Foster, Tiaundra) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Joint MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Uniform Stipulated Protective Order)(Foster, Tiaundra) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Withdraw #20 MOTION for Protective Order JOINT (Docket Entries Nos. 20 and 20-1), filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK INC.. (Foster, Tiaundra) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/30/2020 02:00 PM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/12/2019.(SWM) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK INC.. (Foster, Tiaundra) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Tiaundra Marie Foster on behalf of Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK INC.. (Foster, Tiaundra) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK INC.. (Shelton, Brandon) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon M. Shelton on behalf of Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK INC.. (Shelton, Brandon) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK INC. (JRB) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Darron S. Stewart on behalf of Plaintiff NANCY KRUMWIED. (Stewart, Darron) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Cherry Malichi on behalf of Plaintiff NANCY KRUMWIED. (Malichi, Cherry) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK INC., filed by NANCY KRUMWIED. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5753241) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Rights Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Malichi, Cherry) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.