This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2021 at 08:26:20 (UTC).

Krueger v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 Krueger filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Theresa L Fricke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-05477

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Theresa L Fricke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hannah Krueger

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Interested Party

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles W Talbot

Attorney at TALBOT & ASSOC

5005 Center St, Ste E

Tacoma, WA 98409

Defendant Attorney

Kerry Jane Keefe

Attorney at US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (SEA)

700 Stewart St, Ste 5220

Seattle, WA 98101-1271

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke, re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (DK) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to US Attorney Western Washington & OGC Social Security Administration on 7/15/2021, filed by Plaintiff Hannah Krueger. (Talbot, Charles) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DK) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Hannah Krueger.(DK) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke, re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (DK) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • Docket(#2) CONSENT by Plaintiff to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (KEB) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketJudge Theresa L Fricke added. (AMD) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Hannah Krueger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Talbot, Charles) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Social Security Administrative Record is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kerry Jane Keefe