This case was last updated from PACER on 08/02/2019 at 08:21:04 (UTC).

Krongold et al v. iRelocation System et al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2019 Krongold filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against iRelocation System. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are David N. Hurd and Andrew T. Baxter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00658

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David N. Hurd

Referral Judge

Andrew T. Baxter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Joseph Krongold

Samantha Krongold

Defendants

The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company

iRelocation System

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Verne Pedro

Attorney at Merlin Law Group - NJ Office

125 Half Mile Road, Suite 201

Red Bank, NJ 07701

Paul Lasalle

Attorney at Merlin Law Group, P.A.

125 Half Mile Road, Suite 201

Red Bank, NJ 07701

Defendant Attorney

Meg R. Reid

Attorney at Keane and Associates

P.O. Box 2996

Hartford, CT 06104-2996

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CONSENT ORDER - That any and all demands asserted by Plaintiffs for consequential damages, attorney's fees and costs of suit against Travelers are hereby dismissed, with prejudice. That Traveler's Motion to Dismiss (Document No. 9) is hereby withdrawn as moot. That Travelers shall file an Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint within twenty (20) days of the date hereof. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 7/30/2019. (jel, ) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#12

(#12) MEMORANDUM OF LAW re #7 Summons Issued Paul L. LASalle Enclosing Request for Substituted Service filed by Joseph Krongold, Samantha Krongold. (Lasalle, Paul) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Joseph Krongold, Samantha Krongold submitted to Judge Hurd attaching proposed consent order relative to motion. (Lasalle, Paul) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Lasalle on behalf of Joseph Krongold, Samantha Krongold (Lasalle, Paul) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

9 #3

Exhibit(s) A to Affidavit of Reid

9 #2

Affidavit of Reid

9 #1

Memorandum of Law

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2019 10:00 AM in Utica before Judge David N. Hurd Response to Motion due by 7/23/2019 Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/29/2019. filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Affidavit of Reid, #3 Exhibit(s) A to Affidavit of Reid) (Reid, Meg) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#8

(#8) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company.. (Reid, Meg) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Andriy Bondarenko, Registered Agent for iRelocation System. (meb) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, CIS, Filing Order, Case Management Plan, Case Assignment and Consent Form served on Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company on 06/06/2019, filed by Joseph Krongold, Samantha Krongold. (Pedro, Verne) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

4 #2

Affidavit

4 #1

Proposed Summons

#4

(#4) Letter Request for issuance of summons as to registered agent for defendant iRelocation System, filed by Joseph Krongold, Samantha Krongold. Amendment to #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued Paul L. LASalle. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Affidavit)(Pedro, Verne) Modified on 6/14/2019 to clarify docket text. (nmk) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

2 #1

Summons Issued as to

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to iRelocation System. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company)(meb) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, iRelocation System (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4759077) filed by Joseph Krongold, Samantha Krongold. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(meb) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CONSENT ORDER - That any and all demands asserted by Plaintiffs for consequential damages, attorney's fees and costs of suit against Travelers are hereby dismissed, with prejudice. That Traveler's Motion to Dismiss (Document No. 9) is hereby withdrawn as moot. That Travelers shall file an Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint within twenty (20) days of the date hereof. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 7/30/2019. (jel, ) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) TEXT ORDER: re #12 Memorandum of Law. Plaintiffs' request for substituted service is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are granted leave to effectuate service of process on defendant iRelocation System by substituted service via certified mail on its relevant liability insurance companies. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 7/30/2019. (nmk) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MEMORANDUM OF LAW re #7 Summons Issued Paul L. LASalle Enclosing Request for Substituted Service filed by Joseph Krongold, Samantha Krongold. (Lasalle, Paul) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Joseph Krongold, Samantha Krongold submitted to Judge Hurd attaching proposed consent order relative to motion. (Lasalle, Paul) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Lasalle on behalf of Joseph Krongold, Samantha Krongold (Lasalle, Paul) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2019 10:00 AM in Utica before Judge David N. Hurd Response to Motion due by 7/23/2019 Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/29/2019. filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Affidavit of Reid, #3 Exhibit(s) A to Affidavit of Reid) (Reid, Meg) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company.. (Reid, Meg) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Andriy Bondarenko, Registered Agent for iRelocation System. (meb) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) TEXT ORDER: granting #4 Letter Request. The clerk is directed to issue the proposed summons as to Andriy Bonarenko, as registered agent for defendant iRelocation System. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 6/17/2019. (nmk) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • ***Answer due date updated for The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company answer due 6/27/2019. (mgh) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, CIS, Filing Order, Case Management Plan, Case Assignment and Consent Form served on Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company on 06/06/2019, filed by Joseph Krongold, Samantha Krongold. (Pedro, Verne) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter Request for issuance of summons as to registered agent for defendant iRelocation System, filed by Joseph Krongold, Samantha Krongold. Amendment to #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued Paul L. LASalle. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Affidavit)(Pedro, Verne) Modified on 6/14/2019 to clarify docket text. (nmk) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 9/3/2019 at 10:30 AM via telephone before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/27/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (meb) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to iRelocation System. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company)(meb) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, iRelocation System (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4759077) filed by Joseph Krongold, Samantha Krongold. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(meb) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.