This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/14/2021 at 09:16:34 (UTC).

Kroner v. PetSmart, LLC.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 Kroner filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PetSmart, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nelson Stephen Roman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-08510

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nelson Stephen Roman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wendi Kroner

Bronx, NY 10461

Defendant

PetSmart, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Seth Brian Rubine

Attorney at RUBINE & CHA, LLC, Attorneys at Law

201 W Passaic St, Ste 203Suite 203

Rochelle Park, NJ 07662

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal. Document filed by PetSmart, LLC...(Rubine, Seth) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal). Document filed by PetSmart, LLC...(Rubine, Seth) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER: The Court waives the Initial Pre-trial Conference and directs the Parties to jointly submit a Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order (blank form attached hereto). Said Scheduling Order shall be submitted to chambers by November 29, 2021. After review and approval of the Scheduling Order, the Court will issue an Order of Reference to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause for general pretrial purposes. The Parties are directed to contact Judge Krause within seven (7) business days of the date of the order of Reference to schedule a conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 11/10/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#9

(#9) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by PetSmart, LLC...(Rubine, Seth) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by PetSmart, LLC...(Rubine, Seth) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: The Court waives the Initial Pre-trial Conference and directs the Parties to jointly submit a Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order (blank form attached hereto). Said Scheduling Order shall be submitted to chambers by November 29, 2021. After review and approval of the Scheduling Order, the Court will issue an Order of Reference to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause for general pretrial purposes. The Parties are directed to contact Judge Krause within seven (7) business days of the date of the order of Reference to schedule a conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 11/10/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal). Document filed by PetSmart, LLC...(Rubine, Seth) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal. Document filed by PetSmart, LLC...(Rubine, Seth) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on Walter Ciacci on 10/15/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by PetSmart, LLC...(Rubine, Seth) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent BC Partners for PetSmart, LLC.. Document filed by PetSmart, LLC...(Rubine, Seth) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by PetSmart, LLC..(Rubine, Seth) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rubine, Seth) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 812777/2021E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25199809).Document filed by PetSmart, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Rubine, Seth) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC COAST DISTRIBUTING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seth B. Rubine