This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/12/2021 at 08:29:54 (UTC).

Kroneberger v. Truist Bank et al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 Kroneberger filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Truist Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is M. Hannah Lauck. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00457

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M. Hannah Lauck

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Greta Kroneberger

Defendants

Truist Bank d/b/a SunTrust Mortgage

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Trans Union, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Casey Shannon Nash

Attorney at Kelly Guzzo PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

Andrew Joseph Guzzo

Attorney at Kelly Guzzo PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

Kristi Cahoon Kelly

Attorney at Kelly Guzzo PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

Defendant Attorneys

Brooke Kelley Conkle

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP (Richmond)

1001 Haxall Point, Suite 1500

Richmond, VA 23219

John Willard Montgomery, Jr.

Attorney at Traylor Montgomery & Elliott PC

130 E Wythe St

Petersburg, VA 23803

David Neal Anthony

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP (Richmond)

Troutman Sanders Bldg, 1001 Haxall Point

Richmond, VA 23219

Gibson Sinclair Wright

Attorney at McCandlish Holton PC

1111 E Main St, Suite 2100

Richmond, VA 23218-0796

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

14 #1

Exhibit 1 (Proposed Agreed Order)

#14

#13

#12

7 #1

Proposed Order

#6

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Anthony, David) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union, LLC.(Wright, Gibson) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to Complaint by Truist Bank.(Conkle, Brooke) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AGREED ORDER: ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Experians Consent Motion for an Extension of Time (ECF #14 ) be, and hereby is, GRANTED, and it is further, ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Defendant, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., shall be GRANTED an extension of time until on or before September 10, 2021 to file its responsive pleadings, including its Answer to the Complaint filed by Greta Kroneberger. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 8/11/2021. (asho, ) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Anthony, David) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Agreed Order))(Anthony, David) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER GRANTING TRANS UNION LLCS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; It is hereby, ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Trans Unions Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint be, and hereby is, GRANTED, and it is further, ORDERED that Trans Union shall be GRANTED an extension of time until September 6, 2021, to file its Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 8/9/2021. (asho, ) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Trans Union, LLC. (Wright, Gibson) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wright, Gibson) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint (ECF #7 ) be granted, and that Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC shall have up to and including September 23, 2021 to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 8/9/2021. (asho, ) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER It is hereby, ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Truists Consent Motion for an Extension of Time (ECF #5 ) be, and hereby is, GRANTED, and it is further, ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Defendant Truist Bank, shall be GRANTED an extension of time until August 23, 2021 to file its responsive pleadings to the Complaint filed by Greta Kroneberger. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 8/9/2021. (asho, ) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Montgomery, John) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Montgomery, John) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Truist Bank. (Conkle, Brooke) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Truist Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Conkle, Brooke) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke Kelley Conkle on behalf of Truist Bank (Conkle, Brooke) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC, Truist Bank. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (adun, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (adun, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons by Greta Kroneberger. (Nash, Casey) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7891178.), filed by Greta Kroneberger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nash, Casey) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUNTRUST MORTGAGE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant