This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2022 at 08:14:49 (UTC).

Kroger Co., The et al v. Agri Stats, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 Kroger Co , The filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Agri Stats, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are John R. Tunheim and Hildy Bowbeer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-00072

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Tunheim

Referral Judge

Hildy Bowbeer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kroger Co., The

Albertsons Companies, Inc.

Hy-Vee Inc

Save Mart Supermarkets

US Foods, Inc.

Defendants

Agri Stats, Inc.

Clemens Food Group, LLC

Clemens Family Corporation, The

Hormel Foods Corporation

Seaboard Foods LLC

Smithfield Foods, Inc.

Triumph Foods, LLC

Tyson Foods Inc.

Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.

Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anna Theresa Neill

Attorney at Kenny Nachwalter, P.A.

Four Seasons Tower

1441 Brickell Avenue, SU 1100

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER (CTO-11) TRANSFERRING CASE to District of Minnesota. In Re: Pork Antitrust Litigation MDL No. 2998. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/14/2022.] (Entered: 01/13/2022)

14 #1

*Restricted*

14 #14

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#12

(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE RE Docket Nos. 20 and 21 in case no. 4:21-cv-05684-HSG. The court has reviewed the motions and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/14/2022.] (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#11

(#11) Summons Issued as to Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Seaboard Foods LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., The Clemens Family Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/14/2022.] (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#9

(#9) Proposed Summons. (Neill, Anna) (Filed on 1/10/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/14/2022.] (Entered: 01/10/2022)

8 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

8 #8

Main Document

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Albertsons Companies, Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc., Save Mart Supermarkets, The Kroger Co., US Foods, Inc... (Neill, Anna) (Filed on 1/4/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/14/2022.] (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/25/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/14/2022.] (Entered: 12/29/2021)

3 #1

Exhibit 1

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Consolidated Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Albertsons Companies, Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc., Save Mart Supermarkets, The Kroger Co., US Foods, Inc. (Neill, Anna) (Filed on 12/28/2021) Modified on 12/29/2021 (gba, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/14/2022.] (Entered: 12/28/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • Docket(#15) TEXT ONLY ENTRYNOTICE TO COUNSEL TO COMPLY WITH MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim 11/12/2021. All papers shall be filed in civil case number 18-cv-1776 (JRT/HB) and no further papers shall be filed in the individual case docket. (MMP) Modified text on 1/24/2022 (MMP). (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:21-cv-10037. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim and Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer per MDL List. (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketTransferring case electronically to the District of Minnesota. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/14/2022.] (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER (CTO-11) TRANSFERRING CASE to District of Minnesota. In Re: Pork Antitrust Litigation MDL No. 2998. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/14/2022.] (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE RE Docket Nos. 20 and 21 in case no. 4:21-cv-05684-HSG. The court has reviewed the motions and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/14/2022.] (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Summons Issued as to Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Seaboard Foods LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., The Clemens Family Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/14/2022.] (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 4/21/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2022 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/14/2022.] (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposed Summons. (Neill, Anna) (Filed on 1/10/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/14/2022.] (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 1/5/22. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/14/2022.] (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/14/2022.] (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Albertsons Companies, Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc., Save Mart Supermarkets, The Kroger Co., US Foods, Inc... (Neill, Anna) (Filed on 1/4/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/14/2022.] (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/25/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/14/2022.] (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/12/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/14/2022.] (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Filing of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related by Albertsons Companies, Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc., Save Mart Supermarkets, The Kroger Co., US Foods, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Neill, Anna) (Filed on 12/28/2021) Modified on 12/29/2021 (gba, COURT STAFF). STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/14/2022.] (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Consolidated Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Albertsons Companies, Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc., Save Mart Supermarkets, The Kroger Co., US Foods, Inc. (Neill, Anna) (Filed on 12/28/2021) Modified on 12/29/2021 (gba, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/14/2022.] (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, The Clemens Family Corporation, Hormel Foods Corporation, Seaboard Foods LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number ACANDC-16756953.). Filed by Hy-Vee, Inc., Albertsons Companies, Inc., Save Mart Supermarkets, The Kroger Co., US Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Neill, Anna) (Filed on 12/28/2021) Modified on 12/29/2021 (gba, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/14/2022.] (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hy-Vee, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SAVE MART SUPERMARKETS is a litigant

Latest cases where US FOODS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant